|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 07/03/1947 | 07/03/1947 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/06/1948 | 13/08/1948 | 54 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61118 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/01/1950 | 27/01/1950 | 23 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/12/1951 | 16/01/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28823 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/08/1953 | 29/08/1953 | 18 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/08/1955 | 01/10/1955 | 32 days | Light Intermediate | WPU Gear removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/12/1956 | 12/01/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28608 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/06/1957 | 11/07/1957 | 18 days | N/CL | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/02/1958 | 31/05/1958 | 112 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/04/1959 | 29/04/1959 | 17 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/05/1959 | 12/05/1959 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/02/1960 | 26/03/1960 | 50 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/08/1960 | 16/08/1960 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/03/1961 | 12/04/1961 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/02/1962 | 03/03/1962 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28412 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/01/1963 | 26/01/1963 | 17 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1947 | General | Glasgow Area: During January ten new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123, Nos. 1118 (17/1), 1119 (20/1), 1120 (22/1), 1121 (24/1), 1122 and 1123 (30/1 or 31/1). Works Nos. checked are: 1113-1118 (25869-74/46) and 1120-1123 (25876-9/46). | SLS/194704 |
28/02/1947 | Queens Park Works | During January ten new Class 'B.1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123 inclusive; whilst during February a further ten appeared, viz., Nos. 1124-1133 inclusive. Works Nos. checked are as follows:, 1114-1118 (25870-4/46), 1120-1123 (25876-9/46), 1125-1133 (25881-9/46). | SLS/194705 |
31/01/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. | SLS/195003 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/01/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1118 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25874 Allocated to Thornton Junction (THJ) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
07/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1947. Dep: 07/03/1947. | ||
21/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1948. Dep: 13/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61118 |
||
05/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/01/1950. Dep: 27/01/1950. | ||
11/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1951. Dep: 16/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28823 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/08/1953. Dep: 29/08/1953. | ||
31/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 31/08/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955. Work undertaken: WPU Gear removed |
||
13/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1956. Dep: 12/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28608 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/06/1957 | Works Visit | |||
09/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/02/1958. Dep: 31/05/1958. | ||
13/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1959. Dep: 29/04/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
05/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/05/1959. Dep: 12/05/1959. | ||
06/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/02/1960. Dep: 26/03/1960. | ||
01/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/08/1960. Dep: 16/08/1960. | ||
27/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/03/1961. Dep: 12/04/1961. | ||
03/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1962. Dep: 03/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28412 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/01/1963. Dep: 26/01/1963. | ||
23/07/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61118 from Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
10/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |