Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 530 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2437 Week
» 21219 Month
» 269512 Year
» 1153893 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1121   24/01/1947
BR 61121   04/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L958
Works Number 25877
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 24/01/1947 to Kings Cross (KX)
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 19 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap 5/66 to G Cohen, Kettering

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross (New) 24/01/1947
MAR March 12/06/1949
LIN Lincoln 20/10/1949
CAM Cambridge 20/11/1949
36A Doncaster 28/10/1956
41A Sheffield Darnall 25/01/1959
36A Doncaster 08/02/1959
   Withdrawn 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW KX Kings Cross 24/01/1947
ALLOC MAR March w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 22/10/1949
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 26/11/1949
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 10/11/1956
WDN   17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
24/01/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9709)
04/11/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5089)
23/09/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28502)
03/05/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28585)
03/10/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28538)
24/06/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28264)
20/12/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28149)
27/08/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28120)
19/06/1963 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28803)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 25/09/1948 04/11/1948 41 days General
Boiler number 5089 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61121
 
Stratford Works 14/08/1950 23/09/1950 41 days General
MV lighting removed
Boiler number 28502 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 28/03/1952 03/05/1952 37 days General
Boiler number 28585 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 01/07/1953 03/07/1953 3 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 02/09/1953 03/10/1953 32 days General
Boiler number 28538 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 08/09/1954 17/09/1954 10 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 15/02/1955 24/06/1955 130 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28264 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 05/12/1955 07/01/1956 34 days General  
Doncaster Works 19/04/1956 11/05/1956 23 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 25/11/1957 20/12/1957 26 days General
Boiler number 28149 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 18/08/1958 03/09/1958 17 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 22/07/1960 27/08/1960 37 days General
Boiler number 28120 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 06/02/1961 18/02/1961 13 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 25/04/1963 19/06/1963 56 days General
Boiler number 28803 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/01/1947 To Service To service as LNER Number 1121
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25877
Allocated to Kings Cross (KX)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
25/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1948. Dep: 04/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5089 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61121
   
12/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
20/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
20/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
14/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1950. Dep: 23/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
MV lighting removed
Boiler number 28502 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1952. Dep: 03/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28585 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/07/1953. Dep: 03/07/1953.    
02/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1953. Dep: 03/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28538 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/09/1954. Dep: 17/09/1954.    
15/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/02/1955. Dep: 24/06/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28264 (Diagram 100A)
   
05/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1955. Dep: 07/01/1956.    
19/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/04/1956. Dep: 11/05/1956.    
28/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
25/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1957. Dep: 20/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28149 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/08/1958. Dep: 03/09/1958.    
25/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
08/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
22/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1960. Dep: 27/08/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28120 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/02/1961. Dep: 18/02/1961.    
25/04/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1963. Dep: 19/06/1963.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28803 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 61121 from Doncaster (36A)    
05/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev