|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1949 | 11/03/1949 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 9686 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61129 |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1951 | 25/01/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28125 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1953 | 14/03/1953 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28318 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1954 | 03/07/1954 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1955 | 16/12/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28333 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 19/03/1957 | 03/05/1957 | 46 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1958 | 06/06/1958 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1958 | 30/07/1958 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1959 | 26/02/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1959 | 19/06/1959 | 4 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 23/10/1961 | 18/11/1961 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28535 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1947 | Queens Park Works | During January ten new Class 'B.1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123 inclusive; whilst during February a further ten appeared, viz., Nos. 1124-1133 inclusive. Works Nos. checked are as follows:, 1114-1118 (25870-4/46), 1120-1123 (25876-9/46), 1125-1133 (25881-9/46). | SLS/194705 |
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/02/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1129 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25885 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
10/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1949. Dep: 11/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9686 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61129 |
||
04/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1951. Dep: 25/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28125 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
17/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
29/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
19/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1953. Dep: 14/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28318 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954. | ||
21/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1955. Dep: 16/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28333 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/03/1957. Dep: 03/05/1957. | ||
06/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/05/1958. Dep: 06/06/1958. | ||
28/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/07/1958. Dep: 30/07/1958. | ||
16/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1959. Dep: 26/02/1959. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
16/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/06/1959. Dep: 19/06/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
23/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1961. Dep: 18/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28535 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
13/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61129 from Wakefield (56A) | ||
10/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield |