Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 133 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4645 Week
» 27151 Month
» 330341 Year
» 1551906 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1132 on 26/02/1947
British Railways 61132   28/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L958
Works Number 25888
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service Fri 26/02/1947 to Kittybrewster (KIT)
Withdrawal Fri 02/09/1966 off Thornton Junction (62A)
Scrapping During 10/1966 at Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane)
Service Life 19 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 10/66 for scrap to Shipbreaking Industries, Faslane

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KIT Kittybrewster (New) on 26/02/1947
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill on 16/05/1949
62B Dundee Tay Bridge on 14/01/1951
62A Thornton Junction on 11/01/1960
   Withdrawn on 02/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW KIT Kittybrewster on 26/02/1947
ALLOC ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 16/01/1960
WDN   on 02/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
26/02/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9719)
28/03/1947 Tablet catcher apparatus fitted
27/12/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28609)
24/11/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28614)
08/07/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28668)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Inverurie Works 26/03/1947 28/03/1947 3 days Light Repair
Tablet catcher apparatus fitted
 
Cowlairs Works 30/06/1948 11/08/1948 43 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 15/09/1949 08/10/1949 24 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 10/08/1950 26/08/1950 17 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 20/11/1952 27/12/1952 38 days General
Boiler number 28609 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 12/08/1954 28/08/1954 17 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 02/02/1955 12/02/1955 11 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 17/03/1955 09/04/1955 24 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 19/09/1955 29/10/1955 41 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 31/10/1956 24/11/1956 25 days General
Boiler number 28614 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 14/05/1957 24/05/1957 11 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 19/02/1958 28/02/1958 10 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 06/01/1959 31/01/1959 26 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 15/08/1959 22/08/1959 8 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 27/01/1960 31/03/1960 65 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 24/03/1961 21/04/1961 29 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 29/05/1961 08/07/1961 41 days General
Boiler number 28668 (Diagram 100A)
 
Inverurie Works 25/11/1963 03/01/1964 40 days Light Intermediate  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1947 Queens Park Works During January ten new Class 'B.1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123 inclusive; whilst during February a further ten appeared, viz., Nos. 1124-1133 inclusive. Works Nos. checked are as follows:, 1114-1118 (25870-4/46), 1120-1123 (25876-9/46), 1125-1133 (25881-9/46). SLS/194705
01/10/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. SLS/194911
06/07/1961 Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) Stripping Shop: 61342, 65902. Erecting Shop: 11713, 61132/97, 64864, 65903, 72005/9, 73078, 73120/51, 76097, 80124, 90097, GNS49. Works Yard: D2584, 72006. Works Shunters: D3393, 65228. Scrap Road: 40627, 56308, 64523, 64892, 67612. Waiting Works: 61101, 61341, 65915, 90542, 90753.Ex-Works : 90640. SLS/196108
02/11/1963 Inverurie Works (Shopped) Shopped: 42737, 45475, D6149, D8030. Cut Up: 60819/27, 60937, 64627, 65253, 65341. Four weeks ending 30th November, 1963. Shopped: 42909, 44955, 65918, D6147/57. Cut Up: 57269, 57336, 57634, 60840/94, 64950, 64629. Four weeks ending 28th December, 1963. Shopped: 42919, 44703, D3930, D6140/42/45/52/54/55/56. Cut Up: 60898, 60972, 64557, 64600, 65900, 90019. Total for 1963: Steam-33 Shopped, 31 other repairs; Diesel-31 Shopped, 15 other repairs; Cut Up 86. Two weeks ending 10th January, 1964. Shopped: 61132, D6150. Cut Up: 60161, 64619. In Shops on 10th January: 44722, 64558/99, D368, D3935, D6139/51/53. Awaiting scrapping: 60089, 60159, 64579. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/02/1947 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1132
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25888
Allocated to Kittybrewster (KIT)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
26/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1947. Dep: 28/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Tablet catcher apparatus fitted
   
30/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/06/1948. Dep: 11/08/1948.    
28/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61132    
16/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
15/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 15/09/1949. Dep: 08/10/1949.    
10/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/08/1950. Dep: 26/08/1950.    
14/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
20/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1952. Dep: 27/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28609 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1954. Dep: 28/08/1954.    
02/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/02/1955. Dep: 12/02/1955.    
17/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/03/1955. Dep: 09/04/1955.    
19/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/09/1955. Dep: 29/10/1955.    
31/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1956. Dep: 24/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28614 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1957. Dep: 24/05/1957.    
19/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/02/1958. Dep: 28/02/1958.    
06/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/01/1959. Dep: 31/01/1959.    
15/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/08/1959. Dep: 22/08/1959.    
11/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
27/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/01/1960. Dep: 31/03/1960.    
24/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/03/1961. Dep: 21/04/1961.    
29/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1961. Dep: 08/07/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28668 (Diagram 100A)
   
25/11/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 25/11/1963. Dep: 03/01/1964.    
02/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 61132 from Thornton Junction (62A)    

prev prev