Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 711 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4259 Week
» 5149 Month
» 313130 Year
» 1197511 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1134   04/03/1947
BR 61134   06/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L958
Works Number 25890
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Tue 04/03/1947 to Kittybrewster (KIT)
Withdrawal Tue 05/10/1965 off Dalry Road (64C)
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane)
Service Life 18 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Sold 11/65 for scrap to Shipbreaking Industries, Faslane

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KIT Kittybrewster (New) 04/03/1947
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 16/05/1949
61A Kittybrewster 09/10/1949
65A Eastfield 22/02/1953
62A Thornton Junction 21/01/1956
65A Eastfield 18/04/1960
67A Corkerhill 31/12/1962
67C Ayr 11/03/1963
64C Dalry Road 31/07/1964
   Withdrawn 05/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW KIT Kittybrewster 04/03/1947
ALLOC ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC KIT Kittybrewster w/e 15/10/1949
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 07/05/1960
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 2w/e 12/01/1963
ALLOC 67C Ayr 4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 4w/e 08/08/1964
WDN   05/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/03/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9720)
05/04/1947 Tablet catcher apparatus fitted
16/10/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28626)
19/03/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28873)
20/10/1959 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
18/12/1959 Modified bogie springs fitted
21/05/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28661)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Inverurie Works 05/04/1947 05/04/1947 1 day Light Repair
Tablet catcher apparatus fitted
 
Cowlairs Works 24/02/1948 06/04/1948 43 days General
Renumbered to BR 61134
 
Cowlairs Works 20/03/1950 06/04/1950 18 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 20/09/1951 16/10/1951 27 days General
Boiler number 28626 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 03/11/1953 28/11/1953 26 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 16/08/1954 18/09/1954 34 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 11/02/1955 19/03/1955 37 days General
Boiler number 28873 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 23/03/1955 26/03/1955 4 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 28/11/1956 22/12/1956 25 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 09/07/1958 16/08/1958 39 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 05/10/1959 20/10/1959 16 days Unclassified
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Cowlairs Works 18/11/1959 18/12/1959 31 days Unclassified
Modified bogie springs fitted
 
Cowlairs Works 07/04/1960 21/05/1960 45 days General
Boiler number 28661 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 10/12/1962 12/01/1963 34 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 14/11/1963 26/11/1963 13 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 04/1965 04/1965   Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/03/1947 To Service To service as LNER Number 1134
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25890
Allocated to Kittybrewster (KIT)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
05/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1947. Dep: 05/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Tablet catcher apparatus fitted
   
24/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1948. Dep: 06/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61134
   
16/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
09/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
20/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 20/03/1950. Dep: 06/04/1950.    
20/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1951. Dep: 16/10/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28626 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
03/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953.    
16/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/08/1954. Dep: 18/09/1954.    
11/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1955. Dep: 19/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28873 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955.    
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
28/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/11/1956. Dep: 22/12/1956.    
09/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/07/1958. Dep: 16/08/1958.    
05/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/10/1959. Dep: 20/10/1959.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
18/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/11/1959. Dep: 18/12/1959.
Work undertaken:
Modified bogie springs fitted
   
07/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1960. Dep: 21/05/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28661 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
10/12/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/12/1962. Dep: 12/01/1963.    
31/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
11/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
14/11/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/11/1963. Dep: 26/11/1963.    
31/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
04/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: ?/04/1965. Dep: ?/04/1965.    
05/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 61134 from Dalry Road (64C)    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane    

prev prev