|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1947 | 24/04/1947 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/12/1948 | 19/01/1949 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3737 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61140 |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1949 | 02/04/1949 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1950 | 11/08/1950 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 9441 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1952 | 09/04/1952 | 28 days | General | Coal weighing tender fitted Boiler number 28185 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/09/1952 | 12/09/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/05/1953 | 28/05/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/09/1953 | 17/10/1953 | 34 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/08/1954 | 28/08/1954 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/09/1954 | 22/09/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/04/1955 | 07/05/1955 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/02/1956 | 03/03/1956 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/12/1956 | 26/01/1957 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28629 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/06/1958 | 12/07/1958 | 20 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/11/1958 | 28/11/1958 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/03/1959 | 11/03/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/05/1959 | 04/06/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/06/1960 | 15/07/1960 | 24 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/08/1960 | 04/08/1960 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/10/1960 | 14/10/1960 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/11/1960 | 17/12/1960 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/07/1961 | 17/08/1961 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/08/1962 | 15/09/1962 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28654 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Inverurie Works | 09/09/1965 | 11/09/1965 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/11/1965 | 18/11/1965 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/06/1966 | 20/08/1966 | 54 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1947 | General | Works Nos. checked of new 'B1' ex Vulcan Foundry are as follows: Nos. 1140-1145 (5498-5503), 1151 (5509), 1157 (5515) and 1158 (5516). | SLS/194708 |
14/06/1952 | Scottish Miscellany | On a trip round the north, quite a variety of locomotives was noted, 55218 was on Aberfeldy Br., No. 44931 was pilot to 54500, 54494 on Up pass. at Murthly and 54467 at Pitlochry. No. 62262 was shunting at Elgin, 54473/82 at Forres, and at Inverness 54445/63/70/1/84 an 57634, 57954 an 73007. 55051 was at Dornoch and it is said locally that C.E. Dept. is to consider possibility of C.R. 0-4-4T as branch engine is getting worn-out. Helmsdale provided 54495, 57587 an 55053, the Dornoch Branch spare engine. Kyle of Lochalsh had only Class 5 LM 4-6-0. The early morning mixed train from Kyle to Dingwall is generally a LM 5MT, brake composite and a string of wagons. Bl, No. 61140 with self-weighing tender is due in Scotland for test purposes. 'Clan' Class engines have been noted working to Stirling and probably beyond. |
SLS/195208 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/04/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1140 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5498 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
23/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
23/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1947. Dep: 24/04/1947. | ||
16/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
20/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1948. Dep: 19/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3737 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61140 |
||
02/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/04/1949. Dep: 02/04/1949. | ||
17/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1950. Dep: 11/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9441 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1952. Dep: 09/04/1952. Work undertaken: Coal weighing tender fitted Boiler number 28185 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
11/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/09/1952. Dep: 12/09/1952. | ||
27/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/05/1953. Dep: 28/05/1953. | ||
14/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 14/09/1953. Dep: 17/10/1953. | ||
20/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/08/1954. Dep: 28/08/1954. | ||
21/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/09/1954. Dep: 22/09/1954. | ||
12/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/04/1955. Dep: 07/05/1955. | ||
15/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/02/1956. Dep: 03/03/1956. | ||
24/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1956. Dep: 26/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28629 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/06/1958. Dep: 12/07/1958. | ||
17/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/11/1958. Dep: 28/11/1958. | ||
02/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1959. Dep: 11/03/1959. | ||
27/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/05/1959. Dep: 04/06/1959. | ||
22/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 22/06/1960. Dep: 15/07/1960. | ||
03/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/08/1960. Dep: 04/08/1960. | ||
10/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/10/1960. Dep: 14/10/1960. | ||
22/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1960. Dep: 17/12/1960. | ||
31/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/07/1961. Dep: 17/08/1961. | ||
15/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1962. Dep: 15/09/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28654 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/09/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1965. Dep: 11/09/1965. | ||
15/11/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/11/1965. Dep: 18/11/1965. | ||
28/06/1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/06/1966. Dep: 20/08/1966. | ||
10/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) | ||
31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61140 from Motherwell (66B) | ||
02/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |