|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/09/1948 | 06/11/1948 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 5094 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61141 |
||
Stratford Works | 19/03/1951 | 05/05/1951 | 48 days | General | MV lighting removed Boiler number 28550 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1952 | 09/05/1952 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1953 | 04/04/1953 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28808 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1953 | 09/04/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1955 | 05/02/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28641 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1956 | 19/12/1956 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28108 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1957 | 09/01/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1958 | 13/12/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28753 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1960 | 27/02/1960 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/12/1960 | 18/01/1961 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28354 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1961 | 15/07/1961 | 6 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1947 | General | Works Nos. checked of new 'B1' ex Vulcan Foundry are as follows: Nos. 1140-1145 (5498-5503), 1151 (5509), 1157 (5515) and 1158 (5516). | SLS/194708 |
29/01/1955 | York MPD | 69369 (34E) mentioned in last month's notes, duly proceeded to Darlington (Bank Top), but was not accepted into North Road works. After returning to York, it spent a considerable time under repair in York shed before proceeding to Darnall (39B) on transfer. 'J25' 65650 an 65654 are now in store at York together with 62345. On 15th January, a Sheffield to Middlesbrough football excursion (M886) was worked throughout by 44855 (19A), which took water in York station platforms. On the same date 61028 (38C) was at York en route for Darlington works for repair. Other GC Section 'Bls' for Darlington works recently have included 61141 (38C), 61152 (39B) and 61328 (40B). 'Patriot' 45510 (5A) was an unusual visitor at York on 17th January. On 21st January, the 9.22 a.m. Leeds (City) to Scarborough was worked by 'B16/1' 61445 (50B) instead of the usual Holbeck Class 5, but 44853 (20A) worked the 3.10 p.m. York to Leeds (City). | SLS/195503 |
02/02/1955 | York Station | 44927 (24E) visited York on 2nd February with an excursion from Blackpool. On the following day 43051 (51D) was at York en route for Doncaster Works, and on 8th February 67748 (34E) was at York bound for Darlington Works with 67720 (34A) proceeding south again after overhaul at Darlington. On 10th February 61078 (38E) was at York returning to the GC section after repair at Darlington and 61141 (38C) arrived in similar circumstances on 12th February. Other unusual visitors to York on 12th February were 78022 on the 9.40 a.m. Sheffield to York (S.O.) and the 1.0 p.m. York to Sheffield (S.O.), 48252 (5B), and 68429 (50C) presumed returning to Selby again after a period of loan to Sunderland. In the northbound direction were 61744 (40F) and 61757 (40F), heading for Cowlairs Works and 90550 (31B) for repair at Darlington. | SLS/195504 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/04/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1141 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5499 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
23/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
16/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
20/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1948. Dep: 06/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5094 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61141 |
||
14/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
20/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
05/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
12/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
18/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
19/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1951. Dep: 05/05/1951. Work undertaken: MV lighting removed Boiler number 28550 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/04/1952. Dep: 09/05/1952. | ||
11/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1953. Dep: 04/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28808 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/04/1953. Dep: 09/04/1953. | ||
07/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1955. Dep: 05/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28641 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
20/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1956. Dep: 19/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28108 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/01/1957. Dep: 09/01/1957. | ||
12/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1958. Dep: 13/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28753 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/02/1960. Dep: 27/02/1960. | ||
16/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1960. Dep: 18/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28354 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/07/1961. Dep: 15/07/1961. | ||
25/07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61141 from Colwick (40E) | ||
09/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Ickles |