|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 31/10/1948 | 15/12/1948 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3732 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61145 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1950 | 20/01/1950 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1950 | 28/01/1950 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1950 | 23/11/1950 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 28276 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1950 | 01/12/1950 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1952 | 24/01/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28302 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1955 | 11/02/1955 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28874 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1955 | 03/03/1955 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1956 | 18/07/1956 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1957 | 14/03/1957 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28405 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1957 | 19/12/1957 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1959 | 21/05/1959 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28150 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/09/1961 | 13/10/1961 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28156 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1947 | General | Works Nos. checked of new 'B1' ex Vulcan Foundry are as follows: Nos. 1140-1145 (5498-5503), 1151 (5509), 1157 (5515) and 1158 (5516). | SLS/194708 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/04/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1145 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5503 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
15/05/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
31/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1948. Dep: 15/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3732 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61145 |
||
10/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/01/1950. Dep: 20/01/1950. | ||
23/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/01/1950. Dep: 28/01/1950. | ||
21/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1950. Dep: 23/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28276 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/11/1950. Dep: 01/12/1950. | ||
30/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
18/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C) | ||
24/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C) | ||
29/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1952. Dep: 24/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28302 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/12/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
18/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1955. Dep: 11/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28874 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1955. Dep: 03/03/1955. | ||
29/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/06/1956. Dep: 18/07/1956. | ||
15/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1957. Dep: 14/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28405 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/11/1957. Dep: 19/12/1957. | ||
21/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1959. Dep: 21/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28150 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1961. Dep: 13/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28156 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
10/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
28/03/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
02/01/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61145 from Colwick (40E) | ||
03/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |