|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 27/10/1947 | 27/10/1947 | 1 day | Unclassified | Stub axle re-welded |
||
Stratford Works | 23/09/1948 | 26/11/1948 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 9431 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61149 |
||
Stratford Works | 19/12/1948 | 03/01/1949 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 25/09/1949 | 29/10/1949 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 14/01/1951 | 24/02/1951 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 28528 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 23/06/1953 | 18/08/1953 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 28324 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1956 | 17/02/1956 | 32 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 24/06/1958 | 22/08/1958 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 28184 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 13/04/1959 | 30/04/1959 | 18 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 31/07/1959 | 11/08/1959 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1960 | 28/10/1960 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28374 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/04/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1149 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5507 Allocated to Stratford (STR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
31/05/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
27/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/10/1947. Dep: 27/10/1947. Work undertaken: Stub axle re-welded |
||
23/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1948. Dep: 26/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9431 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61149 |
||
19/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/12/1948. Dep: 03/01/1949. | ||
25/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/09/1949. Dep: 29/10/1949. | ||
14/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1951. Dep: 24/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28528 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1953. Dep: 18/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28324 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1956. Dep: 17/02/1956. | ||
24/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1958. Dep: 22/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28184 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
13/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1959. Dep: 30/04/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
31/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/07/1959. Dep: 11/08/1959. | ||
29/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1960. Dep: 28/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28374 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
16/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61149 from March (31B) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |