|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/08/1948 | 09/10/1948 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 3727 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61151 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/04/1949 | 09/04/1949 | 4 days | Light Repair | Stub axle to weld |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1950 | 04/08/1950 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28261 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1950 | 11/08/1950 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1950 | 16/09/1950 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1952 | 07/06/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28434 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/01/1954 | 20/02/1954 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 28424 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1954 | 26/02/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1954 | 02/03/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1954 | 19/03/1954 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1955 | 12/08/1955 | 40 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/02/1956 | 22/03/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28253 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1957 | 03/01/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28559 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/10/1958 | 17/10/1958 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1960 | 11/02/1960 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28267 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1960 | 18/02/1960 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1960 | 21/12/1960 | 5 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1947 | General | Works Nos. checked of new 'B1' ex Vulcan Foundry are as follows: Nos. 1140-1145 (5498-5503), 1151 (5509), 1157 (5515) and 1158 (5516). | SLS/194708 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/04/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1151 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5509 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
01/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
15/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1948. Dep: 09/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3727 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61151 |
||
06/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/04/1949. Dep: 09/04/1949. Work undertaken: Stub axle to weld |
||
12/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1950. Dep: 04/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28261 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/08/1950. Dep: 11/08/1950. | ||
04/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/09/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950. | ||
15/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1952. Dep: 07/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28434 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1954. Dep: 20/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28424 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1954. Dep: 26/02/1954. | ||
27/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/02/1954. Dep: 02/03/1954. | ||
05/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1954. Dep: 19/03/1954. | ||
04/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1955. Dep: 12/08/1955. | ||
20/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1956. Dep: 22/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28253 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1957. Dep: 03/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28559 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/10/1958. Dep: 17/10/1958. | ||
14/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1960. Dep: 11/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28267 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1960. Dep: 18/02/1960. | ||
17/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/12/1960. Dep: 21/12/1960. | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61151 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |