|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 14/10/1905 | 23/10/1905 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1948 | 27/11/1948 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 9727 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61154 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/08/1950 | 12/10/1950 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28266 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1952 | 26/06/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28440 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1954 | 24/04/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28434 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1955 | 03/01/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28820 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/08/1957 | 18/09/1957 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28267 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1957 | 30/09/1957 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1959 | 26/12/1959 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28521 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/09/1960 | 01/10/1960 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/12/1961 | 04/01/1962 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1962 | 16/03/1962 | 12 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/10/1905 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/10/1905. Dep: 23/10/1905. | ||
06/05/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1154 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5512 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
04/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
11/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1948. Dep: 27/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9727 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61154 |
||
28/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1950. Dep: 12/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28266 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1952. Dep: 26/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28440 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1954. Dep: 24/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28434 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1955. Dep: 03/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28820 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1957. Dep: 18/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28267 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/09/1957. Dep: 30/09/1957. | ||
02/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1959. Dep: 26/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28521 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/09/1960. Dep: 01/10/1960. | ||
27/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/12/1961. Dep: 04/01/1962. | ||
05/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1962. Dep: 16/03/1962. | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61154 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |