|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/04/1949 | 07/05/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 9765 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61160 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1950 | 22/04/1950 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1951 | 14/04/1951 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 28305 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1951 | 21/04/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1952 | 02/11/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1952 | 18/12/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28292 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1953 | 29/08/1953 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1954 | 27/05/1954 | 60 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 06/09/1954 | 15/10/1954 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28857 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/03/1956 | 04/05/1956 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 28514 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 17/02/1958 | 02/05/1958 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 28374 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 24/12/1958 | 12/01/1959 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 15/06/1959 | 01/07/1959 | 17 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/09/1960 | 08/10/1960 | 25 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Old Works) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/05/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1160 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5518 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
04/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1949. Dep: 07/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9765 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61160 |
||
28/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/03/1950. Dep: 22/04/1950. | ||
17/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1951. Dep: 14/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28305 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/04/1951. Dep: 21/04/1951. | ||
01/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1952. Dep: 02/11/1952. | ||
17/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1952. Dep: 18/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28292 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/08/1953. Dep: 29/08/1953. | ||
29/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/03/1954. Dep: 27/05/1954. | ||
20/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
06/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1954. Dep: 15/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28857 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1956. Dep: 04/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28514 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
06/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
17/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1958. Dep: 02/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28374 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
24/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/12/1958. Dep: 12/01/1959. | ||
15/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1959. Dep: 01/07/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
19/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
13/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
20/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
27/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
14/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1960. Dep: 08/10/1960. | ||
01/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61160 from Colwick (40E) | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |