|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1947 | 14/10/1947 | 1 day | Unclassified | Electric lighting fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/07/1949 | 05/08/1949 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 9838 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61165 |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1951 | 02/10/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28151 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1953 | 12/12/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28176 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1955 | 22/02/1955 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1955 | 17/11/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28331 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1958 | 17/04/1958 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1959 | 01/01/1960 | 66 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1961 | 24/02/1961 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28857 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/05/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1165 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5523 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
14/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
14/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/10/1947. Dep: 14/10/1947. Work undertaken: Electric lighting fitted |
||
14/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1949. Dep: 05/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9838 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61165 |
||
02/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1951. Dep: 02/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28151 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1953. Dep: 12/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28176 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/01/1955. Dep: 22/02/1955. | ||
20/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1955. Dep: 17/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28331 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/03/1958. Dep: 17/04/1958. | ||
28/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/10/1959. Dep: 01/01/1960. | ||
25/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1961. Dep: 24/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28857 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
01/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61165 from Canklow (41D) | ||
01/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |