Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1171   11/06/1947
BR 61171   03/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2333
Works Number 5529
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 11/06/1947 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962 off March (31B)
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)
Service Life 15 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 6/63 for scrap to Central Wagon Co, Ince

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) 11/06/1947
GRA Grantham 04/07/1947
STR Stratford 11/12/1949
40A Lincoln 21/10/1951
36A Doncaster 19/12/1954
30A Stratford 16/06/1957
31A Cambridge 12/04/1959
31B March 20/11/1960
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW GOR Gorton 11/06/1947
ALLOC GRA Grantham 04/07/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 17/12/1949
ALLOC 40A Lincoln w/e 27/10/1951
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 26/11/1960
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/06/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9757)
19/09/1947 Electric lighting fitted
03/03/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9830)
10/02/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28522)
29/04/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28861)
16/12/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28344)
23/11/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28114)
05/12/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28587)
18/08/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28594)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 14/09/1947 19/09/1947 6 days Unclassified
Electric lighting fitted
 
Doncaster Works 25/01/1949 03/03/1949 38 days General
Boiler number 9830 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61171
 
Stratford Works 31/12/1950 10/02/1951 42 days General
Boiler number 28522 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 31/03/1953 29/04/1953 30 days General
Boiler number 28861 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 18/11/1954 16/12/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 28344 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 23/10/1956 23/11/1956 32 days General
Boiler number 28114 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 27/11/1956 28/11/1956 2 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 20/10/1958 05/12/1958 47 days General
Boiler number 28587 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 18/07/1960 18/08/1960 32 days General
Boiler number 28594 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 12/10/1961 27/10/1961 16 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/06/1947 To Service To service as LNER Number 1171
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5529
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
04/07/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
14/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/09/1947. Dep: 19/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Electric lighting fitted
   
25/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1949. Dep: 03/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9830 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61171
   
11/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
31/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1950. Dep: 10/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28522 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
31/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1953. Dep: 29/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28861 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1954. Dep: 16/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28344 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
23/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1956. Dep: 23/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28114 (Diagram 100A)
   
27/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1956. Dep: 28/11/1956.    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1958. Dep: 05/12/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28587 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
18/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1960. Dep: 18/08/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28594 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
12/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/10/1961. Dep: 27/10/1961.    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61171 from March (31B)    
06/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan    

prev prev