|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1948 | 24/01/1949 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 9729 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61175 |
||
Stratford Works | 08/10/1950 | 25/11/1950 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 28513 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/12/1951 | 15/01/1952 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1952 | 31/03/1952 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1952 | 26/09/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28330 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1952 | 10/10/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1954 | 25/02/1954 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28153 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1954 | 05/01/1955 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1955 | 18/06/1955 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28352 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1956 | 09/02/1956 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1956 | 10/08/1956 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1957 | 01/05/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28121 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1958 | 26/02/1958 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1959 | 23/07/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28405 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1959 | 27/07/1959 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1961 | 29/09/1961 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28610 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/06/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1175 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5533 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
20/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
10/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1948. Dep: 24/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9729 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61175 |
||
07/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
08/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1950. Dep: 25/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28513 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
27/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
24/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/12/1951. Dep: 15/01/1952. | ||
19/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/03/1952. Dep: 31/03/1952. | ||
28/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1952. Dep: 26/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28330 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/10/1952. Dep: 10/10/1952. | ||
03/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1954. Dep: 25/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28153 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1954. Dep: 05/01/1955. | ||
12/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1955. Dep: 18/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28352 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/01/1956. Dep: 09/02/1956. | ||
23/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/07/1956. Dep: 10/08/1956. | ||
27/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1957. Dep: 01/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28121 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/02/1958. Dep: 26/02/1958. | ||
18/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1959. Dep: 23/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28405 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/07/1959. Dep: 27/07/1959. | ||
16/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
16/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1961. Dep: 29/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28610 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61175 from Colwick (40E) | ||
11/02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |