Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 182 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 182 Week
» 6316 Month
» 234200 Year
» 1455765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1177 on 25/06/1947
BR 61177   03/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2333
Works Number 5535
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service Sun 25/06/1947 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Sun 22/09/1963 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 16 yrs, 2 mths , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 12/63 for scrap to J Cashmore, Great Bridge

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) 25/06/1947
GRA Grantham 20/07/1947
STR Stratford 29/09/1949
40A Lincoln 21/10/1951
31A Cambridge 23/10/1955
38A Colwick 28/10/1956
   Withdrawn 22/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW GOR Gorton 25/06/1947
ALLOC GRA Grantham 20/07/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 40A Lincoln w/e 27/10/1951
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 10/11/1956
WDN   22/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
25/06/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9763)
03/06/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9754)
10/02/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28532)
29/05/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28154)
31/03/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28808)
01/03/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28585)
27/11/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28506)
10/01/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28370)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/05/1951 B17\'s in service No. 61670, de-streamlined, was first seen on 5th May hauling 'The Broadsman' cars from Stratford to Liverpool St. It later worked the 4.5 p.m. to Norwich. The engine appears to be a conventional B17/6 with high capacity tender but the opportunity of putting it back into service with the handsome high-sided tender previously attached has been missed. On Friday, 4th May, No. 61177 hauled the 6.25 p.m. special non-stop from Liverpool St. to Clacton, carrying a white headboard lettered 'Tulip Time Express' in black. SLS/195107
27/10/1951 Effects of withdrawal of Standard 7MT\'s on GE Section During w/e 27th October, the effects of the withdrawal of the Standard 7MT Pacifics for mechanical alterations was very apparent on the GE Section. The difficulties of providing suitable power were alleviated to some extent by the presence of the Southern Region light Pacifics but even so, on 24th October, the Down 'Norfolkman' suffered a late start of 15 minutes waiting engine, but despite speed restrictions at Ilford and Gidea Park this train, hauled by 61177, only lost four minutes to Ipswich. On 25th October, 61205 put up a fine performance despite these speed orders, coming to a stand at Ipswich two minutes early at 10.44. In general, however, the running of the fast trains was not up to the standard of the Pacific workings, although the position steadily improved when the initial shock of the withdrawal of the Pacifics had passed. During the next week some additions were made to GE Section motive power, and on Saturday, 3rd November, the Norfolkman left behind 73000. Subsequently, on Monday, 5th November, 73002 was observed on the 8.30 Norwich down, and a new addition to the Eastern Region engines, 34089 from the Southern Region, took charge of the 9.30 'Norfolkman.' SLS/195201
19/12/1960 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. SLS/196102
31/12/1961 Leicester GC V2s 60815/50/63/90 have been placed in store and replaced by Bls 61077/1177/1206. B1 61381 an 40167 are also in store here. SLS/196201

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 04/05/1949 03/06/1949 31 days General
Boiler number 9754 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61177
 
Stratford Works 31/12/1950 10/02/1951 42 days General
Boiler number 28532 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 05/05/1953 29/05/1953 25 days General
Boiler number 28154 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 26/10/1954 03/11/1954 9 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 27/02/1955 31/03/1955 33 days General
Boiler number 28808 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 11/04/1955 12/04/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/02/1957 01/03/1957 25 days General
Boiler number 28585 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 22/10/1958 27/11/1958 37 days General
Boiler number 28506 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 19/02/1960 26/02/1960 8 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 06/12/1960 10/01/1961 36 days General
Boiler number 28370 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/06/1947 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1177
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5535
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
20/07/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
04/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1949. Dep: 03/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9754 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61177
   
29/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
31/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1950. Dep: 10/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28532 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
05/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1953. Dep: 29/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28154 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/10/1954. Dep: 03/11/1954.    
27/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1955. Dep: 31/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28808 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1955. Dep: 12/04/1955.    
23/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
28/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
05/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1957. Dep: 01/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28585 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1958. Dep: 27/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28506 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/02/1960. Dep: 26/02/1960.    
06/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1960. Dep: 10/01/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28370 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 61177 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev