|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 14/09/1948 | 21/10/1948 | 38 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61178 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/11/1948 | 18/11/1948 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/02/1951 | 17/03/1951 | 20 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/03/1951 | 29/03/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/04/1951 | 05/05/1951 | 10 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/05/1952 | 12/06/1952 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/08/1953 | 29/08/1953 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28660 (Diagram 100A) |
||
R & W Hawthorn | 27/02/1955 | 07/03/1955 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/12/1955 | 31/12/1955 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/02/1956 | 11/02/1956 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/11/1956 | 10/11/1956 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/11/1956 | 15/12/1956 | 25 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/02/1957 | 09/02/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/03/1957 | 30/03/1957 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/05/1957 | 24/05/1957 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/02/1958 | 08/02/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/09/1958 | 26/09/1958 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28615 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/01/1959 | 17/02/1959 | 20 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/10/1959 | 27/10/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/01/1961 | 18/02/1961 | 26 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/08/1961 | 28/09/1961 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/10/1961 | 27/10/1961 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/11/1963 | 23/11/1963 | 5 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/08/1961 | Cowlairs Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D2708/70/4, 44783, 45213, 45361, 61324/46/96, 65919, 80030, 90017, 90386, 90463, 90614. Valve Shop: 73077. Stripping Shop: 65923. Weigh House: 64847. Paint Shop: 73099. Works Yard: D2434, D2726, D3393, 44485, 61178, 64932, 72009, 73005, 80045, 90753. Scrap Yard: 64710 intact, 64700 being out-up. Works Shunters: D2760, D3418. | SLS/196110 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/06/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1178 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5536 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
14/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1948. Dep: 21/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61178 |
||
16/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1948. Dep: 18/11/1948. | ||
26/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 26/02/1951. Dep: 17/03/1951. | ||
27/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/03/1951. Dep: 29/03/1951. | ||
26/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/04/1951. Dep: 05/05/1951. | ||
19/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/05/1952. Dep: 12/06/1952. | ||
07/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1953. Dep: 29/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28660 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/02/1955. Dep: 07/03/1955. | ||
06/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/12/1955. Dep: 31/12/1955. | ||
04/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1956. Dep: 11/02/1956. | ||
05/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/11/1956. Dep: 10/11/1956. | ||
21/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 21/11/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956. | ||
05/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957. | ||
22/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1957. Dep: 30/03/1957. | ||
14/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1957. Dep: 24/05/1957. | ||
04/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/02/1958. Dep: 08/02/1958. | ||
03/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1958. Dep: 26/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28615 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
29/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/01/1959. Dep: 17/02/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
16/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1959. Dep: 27/10/1959. | ||
24/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/01/1961. Dep: 18/02/1961. | ||
28/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/08/1961. Dep: 28/09/1961. | ||
17/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/10/1961. Dep: 27/10/1961. | ||
09/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
18/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
19/11/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1963. Dep: 23/11/1963. | ||
13/02/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61178 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
05/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |