Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 803 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2918 Week
» 25424 Month
» 328614 Year
» 1550179 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1180 on 30/06/1947
British Railways 61180   04/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2333
Works Number 5538
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service Mon 30/06/1947 to Eastfield (EFD)
Withdrawal Mon 01/05/1967 off Dundee West (62B)
Scrapping During 07/1967 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 19 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Sold 7/67 for scrap to Motherwell Machinery & Scrap Co, Wishaw

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield (New) on 30/06/1947
62B Dundee Tay Bridge on 20/06/1955
62C Dunfermline Upper on 28/08/1966
62B Dundee Tay Bridge on 06/11/1966
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill on 27/11/1966
62B Dundee Tay Bridge on 12/03/1967
   Withdrawn on 01/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW EFD Eastfield on 30/06/1947
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 09/07/1955
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 5w/e 10/09/1966
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 12/11/1966
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 3w/e 03/12/1966
ALLOC 62B Dundee West 5w/e 08/04/1967
WDN   on 01/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
30/06/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9766)
14/07/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28643)
04/03/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28519)
30/05/1963 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28635)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Cowlairs Works 02/11/1948 04/12/1948 33 days General
Renumbered to BR 61180
 
Cowlairs Works 12/06/1950 01/07/1950 20 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 22/06/1952 14/07/1952 23 days General
Boiler number 28643 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 12/12/1953 16/01/1954 36 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 14/01/1956 22/02/1956 40 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 01/02/1958 04/03/1958 32 days General
Boiler number 28519 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 30/09/1960 09/11/1960 41 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 19/04/1963 30/05/1963 42 days General
Boiler number 28635 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 10/1964 10/1964   Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1950 Cowlairs Works Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. SLS/195008
14/04/1963 Eastfield MPD (waiting Works) 61008 transferred from LMR, ex Works-65916/32, and waiting Works-44194, 45713/24, 57653, 61147/80/346, 64527, 64790/814/44/69/97/910/24/9, 90060 an 90759. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/06/1947 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1180
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5538
Allocated to Eastfield (EFD)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
02/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1948. Dep: 04/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61180
   
12/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 12/06/1950. Dep: 01/07/1950.    
22/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1952. Dep: 14/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28643 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 12/12/1953. Dep: 16/01/1954.    
20/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
14/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 14/01/1956. Dep: 22/02/1956.    
01/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1958. Dep: 04/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28519 (Diagram 100A)
   
30/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/09/1960. Dep: 09/11/1960.    
19/04/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1963. Dep: 30/05/1963.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28635 (Diagram 100A)
   
10/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 00/10/1964. Dep: 00/10/1964.    
28/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
06/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
27/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
12/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
01/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 61180 from Dundee West (62B)    

prev prev