|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 06/01/1949 | 26/02/1949 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 3768 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61181 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1950 | 19/01/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1951 | 04/08/1951 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28333 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1951 | 14/08/1951 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1953 | 09/05/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28142 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1954 | 16/12/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28208 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/07/1956 | 27/08/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28801 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1958 | 22/05/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28564 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1960 | 03/09/1960 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28190 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/07/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1181 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5539 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
24/08/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
06/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1949. Dep: 26/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3768 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61181 |
||
17/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1950. Dep: 19/01/1950. | ||
12/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1951. Dep: 04/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28333 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1951. Dep: 14/08/1951. | ||
10/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1953. Dep: 09/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28142 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1954. Dep: 16/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28208 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1956. Dep: 27/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28801 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1958. Dep: 22/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28564 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1960. Dep: 03/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28190 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
25/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61181 from March (31B) | ||
12/1963 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 18 | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield |