|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1949 | 25/03/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 9752 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61190 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1951 | 28/04/1951 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28311 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1951 | 14/05/1951 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/10/1952 | 18/11/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28116 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1953 | 22/04/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1954 | 10/07/1954 | 15 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28580 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1955 | 18/03/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28114 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1956 | 27/10/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28144 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1959 | 01/05/1959 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28512 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1961 | 10/06/1961 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28864 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1947 | Queens Park Works | During May eight new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1190-1197 inclusive. Up to 27/6 another eleven 'B.1's' had appeared, viz., Nos. 1198-1208. They were ex Works as follows: 1196 (27/5), 1197 (29/5), 1198 (3/6), 1199 (4/6), 1200 (6/6), 1201 (10/6), 1202 (12/6), 1203 (17/6), 1204 (19/6), 1205 and 1206 (24/6), and 1207 and 1208 . (27/6). Works' Nos. checked are as follows: Nos. 1190-1205 (26091-26106/47) and No. 1207 (26108/47). | SLS/194708 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/05/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1190 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26091 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
22/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1949. Dep: 25/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9752 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61190 |
||
18/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
16/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1951. Dep: 28/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28311 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/05/1951. Dep: 14/05/1951. | ||
23/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1952. Dep: 18/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28116 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/04/1953. Dep: 22/04/1953. | ||
26/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/06/1954. Dep: 10/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28580 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1955. Dep: 18/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28114 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1956. Dep: 27/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28144 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1959. Dep: 01/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28512 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1961. Dep: 10/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28864 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
20/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61190 from Colwick (40E) | ||
08/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |