|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1948 | 27/01/1949 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 9761 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61193 |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1950 | 20/12/1950 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28121 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1951 | 11/01/1951 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1952 | 10/10/1952 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28505 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1954 | 10/07/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28194 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1957 | 27/02/1957 | 28 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1959 | 07/08/1959 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28843 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1947 | Queens Park Works | During May eight new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1190-1197 inclusive. Up to 27/6 another eleven 'B.1's' had appeared, viz., Nos. 1198-1208. They were ex Works as follows: 1196 (27/5), 1197 (29/5), 1198 (3/6), 1199 (4/6), 1200 (6/6), 1201 (10/6), 1202 (12/6), 1203 (17/6), 1204 (19/6), 1205 and 1206 (24/6), and 1207 and 1208 . (27/6). Works' Nos. checked are as follows: Nos. 1190-1205 (26091-26106/47) and No. 1207 (26108/47). | SLS/194708 |
17/05/1947 | Eastfield MPD | New 'B1' were much in evidence here, Nos. 1191/2 on 17/5, Nos. 1194/5 on 24/5, and Nos. 1193-1197 on 31/5. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 No. 77367 was noted on 17/5, not re-numbered L.N.E. No. 3019 as stated in the Journal. (Officially given by the Co. as re-numbered to 3019 on 2/2/47.-Editor). Further 'Austerity' 2-8-0 noted here during the month ended 31/5 were: Nos. 77078, 77225, 71306, 77456, 77470 and 78568; also '07' Nos. 3020, 3089, and 3120. All appeared to be awaiting shop repair. (K.M.). | SLS/194708 |
07/06/1947 | West Highland | Increasing use is being made of the 'B.1' class on the West Highland line. No. 1195 was on the 3.46 p.m. to Fort William on 7/6, with 7 coaches including the restaurant car, while No. 1193 was on an early morning freight train. | SLS/194708 |
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/05/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1193 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26094 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
15/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1948. Dep: 27/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9761 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61193 |
||
26/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1950. Dep: 20/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28121 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/01/1951. Dep: 11/01/1951. | ||
02/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1952. Dep: 10/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28505 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1954. Dep: 10/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28194 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1957. Dep: 27/02/1957. | ||
07/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1959. Dep: 07/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28843 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61193 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
01/11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |