|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | Light Intermediate | ||||||
Cowlairs Works | 18/10/1948 | 25/11/1948 | 39 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61197 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 28/04/1952 | 24/05/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28612 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/08/1952 | 22/08/1952 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/03/1954 | 27/03/1954 | 27 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/08/1954 | 26/08/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/11/1954 | 06/11/1954 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/10/1955 | 08/10/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/11/1955 | 17/12/1955 | 25 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/12/1955 | 24/12/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/02/1956 | 03/03/1956 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/09/1956 | 29/09/1956 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/02/1957 | 30/03/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28631 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/07/1958 | 02/07/1958 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/02/1959 | 18/03/1959 | 22 days | Light Intermediate | Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/05/1959 | 20/05/1959 | 2 days | Light Casual | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/09/1959 | 09/09/1959 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/03/1960 | 12/03/1960 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/06/1961 | 08/07/1961 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 10845 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 31/07/1963 | 02/08/1963 | 3 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1947 | Queens Park Works | During May eight new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1190-1197 inclusive. Up to 27/6 another eleven 'B.1's' had appeared, viz., Nos. 1198-1208. They were ex Works as follows: 1196 (27/5), 1197 (29/5), 1198 (3/6), 1199 (4/6), 1200 (6/6), 1201 (10/6), 1202 (12/6), 1203 (17/6), 1204 (19/6), 1205 and 1206 (24/6), and 1207 and 1208 . (27/6). Works' Nos. checked are as follows: Nos. 1190-1205 (26091-26106/47) and No. 1207 (26108/47). | SLS/194708 |
31/05/1947 | Queens Park Works | During May eight new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1190-1197 inclusive. Up to 27/6 another eleven 'B.1's' had appeared, viz., Nos. 1198-1208. They were ex Works as follows: 1196 (27/5), 1197 (29/5), 1198 (3/6), 1199 (4/6), 1200 (6/6), 1201 (10/6), 1202 (12/6), 1203 (17/6), 1204 (19/6), 1205 and 1206 (24/6), and 1207 and 1208 . (27/6). Works' Nos. checked are as follows: Nos. 1190-1205 (26091-26106/47) and No. 1207 (26108/47). | SLS/194708 |
17/05/1947 | Eastfield MPD | New 'B1' were much in evidence here, Nos. 1191/2 on 17/5, Nos. 1194/5 on 24/5, and Nos. 1193-1197 on 31/5. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 No. 77367 was noted on 17/5, not re-numbered L.N.E. No. 3019 as stated in the Journal. (Officially given by the Co. as re-numbered to 3019 on 2/2/47.-Editor). Further 'Austerity' 2-8-0 noted here during the month ended 31/5 were: Nos. 77078, 77225, 71306, 77456, 77470 and 78568; also '07' Nos. 3020, 3089, and 3120. All appeared to be awaiting shop repair. (K.M.). | SLS/194708 |
06/07/1961 | Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) | Stripping Shop: 61342, 65902. Erecting Shop: 11713, 61132/97, 64864, 65903, 72005/9, 73078, 73120/51, 76097, 80124, 90097, GNS49. Works Yard: D2584, 72006. Works Shunters: D3393, 65228. Scrap Road: 40627, 56308, 64523, 64892, 67612. Waiting Works: 61101, 61341, 65915, 90542, 90753.Ex-Works : 90640. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
0000 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - | ||
29/05/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1197 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26098 Allocated to Eastfield (EFD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
18/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1948. Dep: 25/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61197 |
||
28/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1952. Dep: 24/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28612 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/08/1952. Dep: 22/08/1952. | ||
01/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/03/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954. | ||
23/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/08/1954. Dep: 26/08/1954. | ||
01/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/11/1954. Dep: 06/11/1954. | ||
05/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/10/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955. | ||
23/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/11/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955. | ||
21/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/12/1955. Dep: 24/12/1955. | ||
27/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/02/1956. Dep: 03/03/1956. | ||
19/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/09/1956. Dep: 29/09/1956. | ||
26/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1957. Dep: 30/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28631 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/07/1958. Dep: 02/07/1958. | ||
25/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 25/02/1959. Dep: 18/03/1959. Work undertaken: Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
19/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/05/1959. Dep: 20/05/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
03/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/09/1959. Dep: 09/09/1959. | ||
07/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1960. Dep: 12/03/1960. | ||
13/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1961. Dep: 08/07/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10845 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) | ||
11/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ayr (67C) | ||
31/07/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/07/1963. Dep: 02/08/1963. | ||
08/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61197 from Ayr (67C) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |