|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1949 | 21/07/1949 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 9828 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61200 |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1951 | 18/04/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28137 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1953 | 06/02/1953 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28124 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 05/04/1954 | 15/04/1954 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1954 | 25/01/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28859 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/05/1955 | 12/05/1955 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1956 | 22/09/1956 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28109 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1958 | 19/07/1958 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28112 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1960 | 20/07/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28100 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1947 | Queens Park Works | During May eight new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1190-1197 inclusive. Up to 27/6 another eleven 'B.1's' had appeared, viz., Nos. 1198-1208. They were ex Works as follows: 1196 (27/5), 1197 (29/5), 1198 (3/6), 1199 (4/6), 1200 (6/6), 1201 (10/6), 1202 (12/6), 1203 (17/6), 1204 (19/6), 1205 and 1206 (24/6), and 1207 and 1208 . (27/6). Works' Nos. checked are as follows: Nos. 1190-1205 (26091-26106/47) and No. 1207 (26108/47). | SLS/194708 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/06/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1200 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26101 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
15/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1949. Dep: 21/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9828 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61200 |
||
21/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1951. Dep: 18/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28137 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1953. Dep: 06/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28124 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/04/1954. Dep: 15/04/1954. | ||
21/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1954. Dep: 25/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28859 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/05/1955. Dep: 12/05/1955. | ||
13/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1956. Dep: 22/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28109 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1958. Dep: 19/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28112 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
27/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
13/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1960. Dep: 20/07/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28100 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61200 from Kings Cross (34A) | ||
02/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |