Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 329 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4067 Week
» 1580 Month
» 229464 Year
» 1451029 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1201 on 10/06/1947
BR 61201   29/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26102
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service Mon 10/06/1947 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Mon 01/01/1962 off Agecroft (26B)
Scrapping Tue 30/01/1962 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 14 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys

Notes
Notes 30/1/62 In for cutting up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 10/06/1947
32B Ipswich 30/04/1950
38A Colwick 20/09/1953
38C Leicester (G.C.) 19/12/1954
38A Colwick 20/02/1956
15E Leicester (G.C.) 26/10/1958
26B Agecroft 29/08/1959
   Withdrawn 01/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW DON Doncaster 10/06/1947
ALLOC 32B Ipswich m/e 30/04/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 26/02/1955
LOAN 15E Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 29/11/1958
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 21/02/1959
LOAN 26B Agecroft 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   w/e 06/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/06/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9838)
29/07/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9694)
03/03/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28534)
08/11/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28586)
11/09/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28585)
30/01/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28270)
26/02/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28576)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Queens Park Works During May eight new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1190-1197 inclusive. Up to 27/6 another eleven 'B.1's' had appeared, viz., Nos. 1198-1208. They were ex Works as follows: 1196 (27/5), 1197 (29/5), 1198 (3/6), 1199 (4/6), 1200 (6/6), 1201 (10/6), 1202 (12/6), 1203 (17/6), 1204 (19/6), 1205 and 1206 (24/6), and 1207 and 1208 . (27/6). Works' Nos. checked are as follows: Nos. 1190-1205 (26091-26106/47) and No. 1207 (26108/47). SLS/194708
06/08/1947 Queens Park Works On 6/8 Nos. 1201-1203 were in the Paint Shop, Nos. 1204-1210 were complete in the Erecting Shop, the latter being in steam prior to under-going steaming trials that afternoon. No. 1211 was in an advanced state of completion, being only minus bogie and chimney, while No. 1212 was awaiting wheels, cab and chimney. No. 1210 onwards have a rocking grate fitted, while all of this batch have hopper ash-pans, self-cleaning smoke-boxes, and electric lighting provided by a Stone's turbo-generator mounted on the footplating at the right-hand side of the smoke-box. The cab lighting comprises a lamp with wire guard on the underside of the cab roof, and a hooded lamp at each water gauge and at the steam pressure and vacuum gauges-five in all. Sockets for an inspection lamp are provided under the footplating on each side of the engine (above the driving wheels), but neither the sockets for the headlamps or the lamps themselves are fitted, the cables being run forward and the ends bound with insulating tape. As in the previous batch, the speed indicator drive off the left-hand rear coupled wheel crank pin is fitted, but not the speed indicator itself. SLS/194708

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 20/06/1949 29/07/1949 40 days General
Boiler number 9694 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61201
 
Stratford Works 17/01/1951 03/03/1951 46 days General
Boiler number 28534 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 23/09/1952 08/11/1952 47 days General
Boiler number 28586 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1953 21/11/1953 1 day Light Casual  
Gorton Works 31/07/1954 11/09/1954 43 days General
Boiler number 28585 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 29/12/1956 30/01/1957 33 days General
Boiler number 28270 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 02/06/1958 03/07/1958 32 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 02/02/1959 26/02/1959 25 days General
Boiler number 28576 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 18/11/1959 26/01/1960 70 days Heavy Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/06/1947 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1201
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26102
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
20/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1949. Dep: 29/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9694 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61201
   
30/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
17/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1951. Dep: 03/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28534 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28586 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
21/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1953. Dep: 21/11/1953.    
31/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1954. Dep: 11/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28585 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
20/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
29/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1956. Dep: 30/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28270 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1958. Dep: 03/07/1958.    
26/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
02/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1959. Dep: 26/02/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28576 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
18/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/11/1959. Dep: 26/01/1960.    
01/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61201 from Agecroft (26B)    

prev prev