Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1203   17/06/1947
BR 61203   03/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26104
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Mon 17/06/1947 to Kings Cross (KX)
Withdrawal Mon 23/07/1962 off March (31B)
Scrapping During 07/1962 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 15 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up Doncaster

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross (New) 17/06/1947
31A Cambridge 20/10/1957
31B March 11/09/1960
   Withdrawn 23/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW KX Kings Cross 17/06/1947
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 01/10/1960
WDN   23/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
17/06/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9840)
03/06/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9848)
06/03/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28131)
12/12/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28751)
25/05/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28327)
28/06/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28554)
28/06/1958 Modified bogie springs fitted
26/03/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28320)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 01/05/1949 03/06/1949 34 days General
Boiler number 9848 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61203
 
Doncaster Works 12/02/1951 06/03/1951 23 days General
Boiler number 28131 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 19/11/1952 12/12/1952 24 days General
Boiler number 28751 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 31/03/1953 02/04/1953 3 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 24/08/1953 27/08/1953 4 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 02/11/1954 26/11/1954 25 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/04/1956 25/05/1956 32 days General
Boiler number 28327 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 05/05/1958 28/06/1958 55 days General
Boiler number 28554 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
 
Doncaster Works 27/02/1960 26/03/1960 29 days General
Boiler number 28320 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 18/07/1962 18/07/1962 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/06/1947 To Service To service as LNER Number 1203
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26104
Allocated to Kings Cross (KX)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
01/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1949. Dep: 03/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9848 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61203
   
12/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1951. Dep: 06/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28131 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1952. Dep: 12/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28751 (Diagram 100A)
   
31/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1953. Dep: 02/04/1953.    
24/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/08/1953. Dep: 27/08/1953.    
02/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1954. Dep: 26/11/1954.    
24/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1956. Dep: 25/05/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28327 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
05/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1958. Dep: 28/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28554 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
   
27/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1960. Dep: 26/03/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28320 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    
18/07/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 18/07/1962. Dep: 18/07/1962.    
23/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61203 from March (31B)    

prev prev