|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1949 | 10/11/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 9867 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61206 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1951 | 14/01/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28166 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1952 | 02/09/1952 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 10/11/1953 | 18/12/1953 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28596 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1955 | 22/12/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28294 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1957 | 12/09/1957 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28154 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1959 | 08/05/1959 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28411 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1961 | 13/06/1961 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28279 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1962 | 14/08/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
06/08/1947 | Queens Park Works | On 6/8 Nos. 1201-1203 were in the Paint Shop, Nos. 1204-1210 were complete in the Erecting Shop, the latter being in steam prior to under-going steaming trials that afternoon. No. 1211 was in an advanced state of completion, being only minus bogie and chimney, while No. 1212 was awaiting wheels, cab and chimney. No. 1210 onwards have a rocking grate fitted, while all of this batch have hopper ash-pans, self-cleaning smoke-boxes, and electric lighting provided by a Stone's turbo-generator mounted on the footplating at the right-hand side of the smoke-box. The cab lighting comprises a lamp with wire guard on the underside of the cab roof, and a hooded lamp at each water gauge and at the steam pressure and vacuum gauges-five in all. Sockets for an inspection lamp are provided under the footplating on each side of the engine (above the driving wheels), but neither the sockets for the headlamps or the lamps themselves are fitted, the cables being run forward and the ends bound with insulating tape. As in the previous batch, the speed indicator drive off the left-hand rear coupled wheel crank pin is fitted, but not the speed indicator itself. | SLS/194708 |
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
31/12/1961 | Leicester GC | V2s 60815/50/63/90 have been placed in store and replaced by Bls 61077/1177/1206. B1 61381 an 40167 are also in store here. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1206 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26107 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
08/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1949. Dep: 10/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9867 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61206 |
||
05/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
26/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
01/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
07/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
13/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
09/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1951. Dep: 14/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28166 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1952. Dep: 02/09/1952. | ||
28/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
05/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
10/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1953. Dep: 18/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28596 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1955. Dep: 22/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28294 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1957. Dep: 12/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28154 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1959. Dep: 08/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28411 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1961. Dep: 13/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28279 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
17/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
14/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 14/08/1962. Dep: 14/08/1962. | ||
09/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
03/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61206 from Woodford Halse (2F) |