Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 147 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3695 Week
» 4585 Month
» 312566 Year
» 1196947 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1209   01/07/1947
BR 61209   27/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26110
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 01/07/1947 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During 02/1963 at Albert Looms (Spondon)
Service Life 15 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 2/63 for scrap to Albert Looms, Spondon

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) 01/07/1947
CLK Colwick 12/02/1948
ANN Annesley 21/03/1948
38A Colwick 14/10/1956
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NWE New England 01/07/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 14/02/1948
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 27/03/1948
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 10/11/1956
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/07/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9846)
27/08/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9746)
04/08/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28334)
22/10/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28317)
13/08/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28232)
05/12/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28140)
14/11/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28291)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 18/07/1949 27/08/1949 41 days General
Boiler number 9746 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61209
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1951 04/08/1951 54 days General
Boiler number 28334 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1951 11/08/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/08/1952 19/09/1952 27 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 09/09/1953 22/10/1953 44 days General
Boiler number 28317 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1953 26/11/1953 31 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 27/10/1954 04/12/1954 39 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 07/12/1954 11/12/1954 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/07/1955 13/08/1955 38 days General
Boiler number 28232 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 07/11/1957 05/12/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 28140 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 07/06/1958 18/06/1958 12 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 10/10/1959 14/11/1959 36 days General
Boiler number 28291 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 26/02/1960 04/03/1960 8 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 22/10/1960 12/11/1960 22 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/07/1947 To Service To service as LNER Number 1209
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26110
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
12/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
18/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9746 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61209
   
12/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1951. Dep: 04/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28334 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1951. Dep: 11/08/1951.    
24/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/08/1952. Dep: 19/09/1952.    
09/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1953. Dep: 22/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28317 (Diagram 100A)
   
27/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/10/1953. Dep: 26/11/1953.    
27/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/10/1954. Dep: 04/12/1954.    
07/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/12/1954. Dep: 11/12/1954.    
07/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1955. Dep: 13/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28232 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
07/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1957. Dep: 05/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28140 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1958. Dep: 18/06/1958.    
10/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1959. Dep: 14/11/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28291 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1960. Dep: 04/03/1960.    
22/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/10/1960. Dep: 12/11/1960.    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61209 from Colwick (40E)    
02/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Albert Looms: Spondon    

prev prev