|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1949 | 10/06/1949 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 9840 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61212 |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1950 | 10/07/1950 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1951 | 13/11/1951 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28157 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 24/03/1954 | 14/05/1954 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 28584 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1956 | 22/06/1956 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28817 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1958 | 03/01/1959 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28585 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1960 | 14/07/1960 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1961 | 21/10/1961 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28539 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/08/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1209 (1/7), 1210 (3/7), *1211 (4/7), 1212 (8/7), 1213 and *1214 (10/7), *1215 (11/7), 1216 (15/7), *1217 (17/7), 1218 and *1219 (1/8), 1220 (6/8), *1221 (7/8), 1222 (11/8), whilst on 12/8 both 1223 and 1224 were in an advanced state. *Ex Q.P. Works painted grey and with white lettering and numbers; the final painting being done at Cowlairs Works. Additional Works Nos. checked are: Nos. 1210 (26111/47), 1212 (26113/47), 1213 (26114/47), 1215 (26116/47), 1218-21 (26119-22/47), 1223-5 (26124-26/47). | SLS/194709 |
06/08/1947 | Queens Park Works | On 6/8 Nos. 1201-1203 were in the Paint Shop, Nos. 1204-1210 were complete in the Erecting Shop, the latter being in steam prior to under-going steaming trials that afternoon. No. 1211 was in an advanced state of completion, being only minus bogie and chimney, while No. 1212 was awaiting wheels, cab and chimney. No. 1210 onwards have a rocking grate fitted, while all of this batch have hopper ash-pans, self-cleaning smoke-boxes, and electric lighting provided by a Stone's turbo-generator mounted on the footplating at the right-hand side of the smoke-box. The cab lighting comprises a lamp with wire guard on the underside of the cab roof, and a hooded lamp at each water gauge and at the steam pressure and vacuum gauges-five in all. Sockets for an inspection lamp are provided under the footplating on each side of the engine (above the driving wheels), but neither the sockets for the headlamps or the lamps themselves are fitted, the cables being run forward and the ends bound with insulating tape. As in the previous batch, the speed indicator drive off the left-hand rear coupled wheel crank pin is fitted, but not the speed indicator itself. | SLS/194708 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Ex Wks.) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
13/12/1964 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | Stored: 60139/49, 61212, 90469/717, 92169/70/5; Also on shed: 48755(1F), D1519/39/45/56, D1766. | SLS/196501 |
23/01/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Waiting works or stored) | Waiting works or stored: 60114/28/57/8, 61212, 62020/33/7/40/51/5/66, 63606/728/906, 90042/469, 92169/70/5/92/8/9. | SLS/196503 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/07/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1212 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26113 Allocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
12/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1949. Dep: 10/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9840 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61212 |
||
07/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/06/1950. Dep: 10/07/1950. | ||
21/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1951. Dep: 13/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28157 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1954. Dep: 14/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28584 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1956. Dep: 22/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28817 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1958. Dep: 03/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28585 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1960. Dep: 14/07/1960. | ||
21/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1961. Dep: 21/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28539 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61212 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
01/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |