|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 18/02/1949 | 19/03/1949 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 9893 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61216 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1950 | 19/08/1950 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 9940 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1950 | 22/08/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1950 | 31/08/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1952 | 03/05/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28418 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1953 | 26/09/1953 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28416 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1953 | 14/10/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1954 | 03/04/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 22/02/1955 | 19/03/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28293 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1955 | 22/03/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1955 | 27/04/1955 | 34 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1956 | 02/01/1957 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1957 | 16/05/1957 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/08/1958 | 05/09/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28258 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1958 | 16/09/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1958 | 14/10/1958 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1959 | 19/06/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 24/11/1959 | 08/12/1959 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1961 | 15/12/1961 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 28545 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/08/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1209 (1/7), 1210 (3/7), *1211 (4/7), 1212 (8/7), 1213 and *1214 (10/7), *1215 (11/7), 1216 (15/7), *1217 (17/7), 1218 and *1219 (1/8), 1220 (6/8), *1221 (7/8), 1222 (11/8), whilst on 12/8 both 1223 and 1224 were in an advanced state. *Ex Q.P. Works painted grey and with white lettering and numbers; the final painting being done at Cowlairs Works. Additional Works Nos. checked are: Nos. 1210 (26111/47), 1212 (26113/47), 1213 (26114/47), 1215 (26116/47), 1218-21 (26119-22/47), 1223-5 (26124-26/47). | SLS/194709 |
31/03/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. | SLS/194905 |
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/07/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1216 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26117 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
23/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
29/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
18/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1949. Dep: 19/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9893 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61216 |
||
11/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1950. Dep: 19/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9940 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/08/1950. Dep: 22/08/1950. | ||
28/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/08/1950. Dep: 31/08/1950. | ||
07/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1952. Dep: 03/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28418 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1953. Dep: 26/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28416 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/10/1953. Dep: 14/10/1953. | ||
27/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/03/1954. Dep: 03/04/1954. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
22/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1955. Dep: 19/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28293 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/03/1955. Dep: 22/03/1955. | ||
25/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/03/1955. Dep: 27/04/1955. | ||
05/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/12/1956. Dep: 02/01/1957. | ||
03/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/05/1957. Dep: 16/05/1957. | ||
01/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1958. Dep: 05/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28258 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
10/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1958. Dep: 16/09/1958. | ||
03/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1958. Dep: 14/10/1958. | ||
09/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/06/1959. Dep: 19/06/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
24/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/11/1959. Dep: 08/12/1959. | ||
15/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
18/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1961. Dep: 15/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28545 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
03/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
23/01/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61216 from York (North) (50A) | ||
03/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh |