Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1223   24/08/1947
BR 61223   31/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26124
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 24/08/1947 to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)
Withdrawal Sun 02/01/1966 off Immingham (40B)
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)
Service Life 18 yrs, 4 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 2/66 for scrap to Garnharn, Harris & Elton, Chesterfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LEI Leicester (G.C.) (New) 24/08/1947
GOR Gorton 02/11/1947
26A Newton Heath 02/07/1950
39A Gorton 11/08/1950
31A Cambridge 20/06/1954
32A Norwich Thorpe 24/06/1957
32D Yarmouth South Town 08/12/1957
32A Norwich Thorpe 14/09/1958
32C Lowestoft 03/05/1959
40A Lincoln 28/02/1960
40B Immingham 20/03/1960
40A Lincoln 27/03/1960
40B Immingham 22/09/1963
   Withdrawn 02/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW LEI Leicester (G.C.) 24/08/1947
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 08/11/1947
LOAN 26A Newton Heath w/e 01/07/1950
LOAN 26A Newton Heath 02/07/1950
LOAN 26A Newton Heath w/e 02/07/1950
EXLOAN 39A Gorton 11/08/1950
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 21/07/1956
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 19/03/1960
ALLOC 40B Immingham 6w/e 05/10/1963
WDN   w/e 02/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
24/08/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9860)
31/12/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9906)
15/03/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28410)
30/05/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28810)
17/04/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28527)
20/03/1959 Modified bogie springs fitted
20/03/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28145)
20/03/1959 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
27/01/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28312)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 21/11/1949 31/12/1949 41 days General
Boiler number 9906 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61223
 
Gorton Works 05/01/1950 07/01/1950 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 21/02/1951 22/02/1951 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/02/1952 15/03/1952 34 days General
Boiler number 28410 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1953 30/05/1953 29 days General
Boiler number 28810 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 24/01/1955 18/03/1955 54 days General  
Stratford Works 30/04/1956 19/06/1956 51 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 18/03/1957 17/04/1957 31 days General
Boiler number 28527 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 23/09/1957 16/10/1957 24 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 02/02/1959 20/03/1959 47 days General
Boiler number 28145 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
 
Stratford Works 06/04/1959 18/04/1959 13 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 03/08/1960 05/08/1960 3 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 23/01/1961 03/02/1961 12 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 03/01/1962 27/01/1962 25 days General
Boiler number 28312 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/08/1947 To Service To service as LNER Number 1223
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26124
Allocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
02/11/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
21/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1949. Dep: 31/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9906 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61223
   
05/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/01/1950. Dep: 07/01/1950.    
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
11/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
21/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/02/1951. Dep: 22/02/1951.    
11/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1952. Dep: 15/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28410 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1953. Dep: 30/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28810 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
24/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1955. Dep: 18/03/1955.    
30/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/04/1956. Dep: 19/06/1956.    
18/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1957. Dep: 17/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28527 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
23/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1957. Dep: 16/10/1957.    
08/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
14/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
02/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1959. Dep: 20/03/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28145 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
   
06/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/04/1959. Dep: 18/04/1959.    
03/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
28/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
20/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
27/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
03/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/08/1960. Dep: 05/08/1960.    
23/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/01/1961. Dep: 03/02/1961.    
03/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1962. Dep: 27/01/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28312 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
02/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 61223 from Immingham (40B)    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield    

prev prev