|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/09/1949 | 01/10/1949 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 9920 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61225 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/02/1951 | 15/02/1951 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 16/04/1951 | 19/04/1951 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1951 | 29/09/1951 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28346 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1951 | 06/10/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1953 | 02/05/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28308 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1953 | 07/05/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1955 | 02/03/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28843 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/02/1957 | 20/03/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28176 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1959 | 19/11/1959 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28845 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1960 | 22/11/1960 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/10/1962 | 28/11/1962 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28410 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1964 | 18/02/1964 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/08/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1225 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26126 Allocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
02/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) | ||
05/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1949. Dep: 01/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9920 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61225 |
||
14/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1951. Dep: 15/02/1951. | ||
16/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/04/1951. Dep: 19/04/1951. | ||
07/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1951. Dep: 29/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28346 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951. | ||
29/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
01/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1953. Dep: 02/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28308 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1953. Dep: 07/05/1953. | ||
05/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1955. Dep: 02/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28843 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
20/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1957. Dep: 20/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28176 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1959. Dep: 19/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28845 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
21/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/11/1960. Dep: 22/11/1960. | ||
23/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1962. Dep: 28/11/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28410 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/02/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1964. Dep: 18/02/1964. | ||
10/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
20/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61225 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
08/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |