Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 523 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2430 Week
» 21212 Month
» 269505 Year
» 1153886 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1227   21/08/1947
BR 61227   18/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26128
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 21/08/1947 to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)
Withdrawal Sun 22/09/1963 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During 01/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 16 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Sold 1/64 for scrap to J Cashmore, Great Bridge

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LEI Leicester (G.C.) (New) 21/08/1947
GOR Gorton 02/11/1947
30A Stratford 30/04/1950
31A Cambridge 04/03/1951
30A Stratford 06/05/1951
30F Parkeston Quay 28/10/1956
40E Colwick 27/11/1960
   Withdrawn 22/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW LEI Leicester (G.C.) 26/08/1947
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 08/11/1947
ALLOC 30A Stratford m/e 30/04/1950
ALLOC 31A Cambridge m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 12/05/1951
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 40E Colwick 5w/e 31/12/1960
WDN   22/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
21/08/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9864)
18/02/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9917)
02/11/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28570)
19/09/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28567)
17/02/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28536)
07/11/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28533)
07/11/1958 Modified bogie springs fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/01/1950 18/02/1950 41 days General
Boiler number 9917 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61227
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1950 24/02/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 14/03/1950 15/03/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 16/09/1951 02/11/1951 48 days General
Boiler number 28570 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 14/08/1953 19/09/1953 37 days General
Boiler number 28567 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 16/01/1956 17/02/1956 33 days General
Boiler number 28536 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 03/10/1957 04/10/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 24/03/1958 16/04/1958 24 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 25/09/1958 07/11/1958 44 days General
Boiler number 28533 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
 
Doncaster Works 15/03/1961 20/04/1961 37 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/09/1961 20/10/1961 22 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 29/08/1963 12/09/1963 15 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/08/1947 To Service To service as LNER Number 1227
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26128
Allocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
02/11/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1950. Dep: 18/02/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9917 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61227
   
23/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1950. Dep: 24/02/1950.    
14/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1950. Dep: 15/03/1950.    
30/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
04/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
06/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1951. Dep: 02/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28570 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1953. Dep: 19/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28567 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1956. Dep: 17/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28536 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
03/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1957. Dep: 04/10/1957.    
24/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1958. Dep: 16/04/1958.    
25/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1958. Dep: 07/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28533 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
   
27/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
15/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1961. Dep: 20/04/1961.    
29/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/09/1961. Dep: 20/10/1961.    
04/08/1962 Sightings Shunted sidings at Melton Mowbray at 5:50pm BackTrack Jan 2007  
04/08/1962 Sightings Worked a summer seasonal special from Skegness to Leicester Belgrave Road BackTrack Jan 2007  
29/08/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/08/1963. Dep: 12/09/1963.    
22/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 61227 from Colwick (40E)    
01/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev