|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1949 | 15/12/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 9843 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61229 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/12/1949 | 23/12/1949 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1951 | 07/01/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28165 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1953 | 21/11/1953 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1954 | 10/07/1954 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 28251 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1955 | 23/11/1955 | 35 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1957 | 04/05/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28266 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1957 | 07/05/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1959 | 17/04/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1960 | 30/04/1960 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28305 (Diagram 100A) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1960 | 01/02/1961 | 72 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1962 | 23/10/1962 | 48 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/09/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's were ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1223 (13/8), 1224 (15/8), 1225 (19/8), 1226 (21/8), 1227 (26/8), 1228 (28/8), 1229 (2/9), 1230 (4/9), 1231 (9/9) and 1232 (10/9). On 11/9 Nos. 1233 an 1234 were in the Paint Shop while in the Erecting Shop Nos. 1235 an 1236 were undergoing steaming trials; No. 1237 was minus the bogie but otherwise virtually complete. Additional Works Nos. checked are: Nos. 1216 (26117/47), 1217 (26118/47), 1222 (26123/47), 1226-33 (26127-34/47), 1235 (26136/47). | SLS/194710 |
11/10/1955 | York (York shed) | An unusual visitor to York in October was 73051 (71G) which worked the 4.15 p.m. stopping passenger train from York to Sheffield (Midland) on 11/10/55. (This is normally a Saltley or Bournville Stanier Class 5 turn.) On 19/10/55 ex-works (Darlington) B1s at York shed were 61110 (37A) and 61229 (37C). On 7/11/55 42860 (26B) worked the 10.10 a.m. York to Manchester (Victoria) and 5.10 p.m. Manchester (Victoria) to York instead of the usual York B1. N5 No. 69357 (36B) was in York shed on 9/11/55, and on 15/11/55 A7 No. 69785 (53C) was in the shed yard en route for Darlington works. On 17/11/55 York had quite a Great Central appearance with 69275 (40A) in the shed and 69256 (40F), 69278 (36D), 69303 (36D), and 69310 (38A) in the shed yard, all in steam, and some marked in chalk 'For Darlington plant'. Another most unusual visitor, both as regards type and shed, on the same day was 7F 0-8-0 49648 (25E). | SLS/195512 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington Works (North Rd. scrap yard) | New Engine Shop: D3940, 12116, tender of 60530. Main Erecting shop: 60530 Sayajirao, 60844, 61214, 61330, 62059, 73095, 73132, 76095/9, 93368/610, D2246/72, D3657. Yard Paint shop: 60118 Archibald Sturrock. Yard: 43008 an 62041 being painted, 60522 Straight Deal, 60145 Saint Mungo, 60011 frames only, 61038 without nameplates, 61084, 63393, 65033/99, 43123, 44734, 68062, D2700, 90407; North Rd. scrap yard: 61229, 61321 and tender of 60020. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/09/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1229 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26130 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
21/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
14/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1949. Dep: 15/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9843 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61229 |
||
20/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1949. Dep: 23/12/1949. | ||
10/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1951. Dep: 07/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28165 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/11/1953. Dep: 21/11/1953. | ||
22/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1954. Dep: 10/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28251 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1955. Dep: 23/11/1955. | ||
05/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1957. Dep: 04/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28266 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1957. Dep: 07/05/1957. | ||
07/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/04/1959. Dep: 17/04/1959. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
23/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1960. Dep: 30/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28305 (Diagram 100A) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
22/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1960. Dep: 01/02/1961. | ||
06/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/09/1962. Dep: 23/10/1962. | ||
29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61229 from Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) | ||
08/09/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |