|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1949 | 06/01/1950 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 9438 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61231 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/01/1952 | 06/02/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28173 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 07/04/1954 | 21/05/1954 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28112 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 19/04/1956 | 24/05/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 10830 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 31/10/1958 | 19/12/1958 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 28584 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1960 | 28/07/1960 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/01/1961 | 28/01/1961 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1961 | 20/05/1961 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1961 | 04/07/1961 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1962 | 27/07/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/09/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's were ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1223 (13/8), 1224 (15/8), 1225 (19/8), 1226 (21/8), 1227 (26/8), 1228 (28/8), 1229 (2/9), 1230 (4/9), 1231 (9/9) and 1232 (10/9). On 11/9 Nos. 1233 an 1234 were in the Paint Shop while in the Erecting Shop Nos. 1235 an 1236 were undergoing steaming trials; No. 1237 was minus the bogie but otherwise virtually complete. Additional Works Nos. checked are: Nos. 1216 (26117/47), 1217 (26118/47), 1222 (26123/47), 1226-33 (26127-34/47), 1235 (26136/47). | SLS/194710 |
02/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/09/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1231 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26132 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
02/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
04/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1949. Dep: 06/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9438 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61231 |
||
13/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1952. Dep: 06/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28173 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1954. Dep: 21/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28112 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1956. Dep: 24/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10830 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1958. Dep: 19/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28584 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/07/1960. Dep: 28/07/1960. | ||
06/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/01/1961. Dep: 28/01/1961. | ||
04/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/05/1961. Dep: 20/05/1961. | ||
12/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/06/1961. Dep: 04/07/1961. | ||
27/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 27/07/1962. Dep: 27/07/1962. | ||
30/07/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61231 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
08/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |