|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 07/01/1949 | 26/02/1949 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 9873 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61233 |
||
Stratford Works | 17/06/1949 | 24/06/1949 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 07/09/1950 | 21/10/1950 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28504 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 24/03/1952 | 25/04/1952 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 22/09/1952 | 01/11/1952 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28524 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 01/12/1952 | 04/12/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 13/12/1954 | 19/02/1955 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 28186 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/04/1957 | 31/05/1957 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28145 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 14/01/1959 | 27/02/1959 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28234 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1960 | 30/08/1960 | 6 days | Unclassified | Boiler number 28180 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1962 | 11/07/1962 | 52 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/09/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's were ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1223 (13/8), 1224 (15/8), 1225 (19/8), 1226 (21/8), 1227 (26/8), 1228 (28/8), 1229 (2/9), 1230 (4/9), 1231 (9/9) and 1232 (10/9). On 11/9 Nos. 1233 an 1234 were in the Paint Shop while in the Erecting Shop Nos. 1235 an 1236 were undergoing steaming trials; No. 1237 was minus the bogie but otherwise virtually complete. Additional Works Nos. checked are: Nos. 1216 (26117/47), 1217 (26118/47), 1222 (26123/47), 1226-33 (26127-34/47), 1235 (26136/47). | SLS/194710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/09/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1233 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26134 Allocated to Stratford (STR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
07/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1949. Dep: 26/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9873 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61233 |
||
17/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/06/1949. Dep: 24/06/1949. | ||
07/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1950. Dep: 21/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28504 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1952. Dep: 25/04/1952. | ||
22/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28524 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/12/1952. Dep: 04/12/1952. | ||
13/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1954. Dep: 19/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28186 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1957. Dep: 31/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28145 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1959. Dep: 27/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28234 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
24/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
25/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/08/1960. Dep: 30/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28180 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
21/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1962. Dep: 11/07/1962. | ||
29/09/1962 | Reinstated | Reinstated to March (31B) | ||
25/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61233 from March (31B) | ||
12/1963 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 21 | ||
05/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |