Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 869 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6678 Week
» 13862 Month
» 321843 Year
» 1206224 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1236   26/09/1947
BR 61236   12/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26137
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 26/09/1947 to Stratford (STR)
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962 off March (31B)
Scrapping During 03/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 14 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 3/63 for scrap to J Cashmore, Great Bridge

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford (New) 26/09/1947
31A Cambridge 12/04/1959
31B March 20/11/1960
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW STR Stratford 26/09/1947
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 26/11/1960
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
26/09/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9873)
12/02/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9721)
11/11/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28510)
20/12/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28530)
20/11/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28521)
15/08/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28131)
12/02/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28810)
12/02/1960 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Stratford Works 31/05/1948 02/06/1948 3 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 19/12/1948 12/02/1949 56 days General
Boiler number 9721 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61236
 
Stratford Works 03/01/1950 06/01/1950 4 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 05/10/1950 11/11/1950 38 days General
Boiler number 28510 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 28/05/1951 28/06/1951 32 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 05/11/1952 20/12/1952 46 days General
Boiler number 28530 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 21/09/1953 26/09/1953 6 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 19/10/1954 20/11/1954 33 days General
Boiler number 28521 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 27/05/1957 15/08/1957 81 days General
Boiler number 28131 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 21/08/1957 23/08/1957 3 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 02/11/1959 12/02/1960 103 days General
Boiler number 28810 (Diagram 100A)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/09/1947 To Service To service as LNER Number 1236
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26137
Allocated to Stratford (STR)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
31/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/05/1948. Dep: 02/06/1948.    
19/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1948. Dep: 12/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9721 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61236
   
03/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1950. Dep: 06/01/1950.    
05/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1950. Dep: 11/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28510 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1951. Dep: 28/06/1951.    
05/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1952. Dep: 20/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28530 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/09/1953. Dep: 26/09/1953.    
19/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28521 (Diagram 100A)
   
27/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1957. Dep: 15/08/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28131 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/08/1957. Dep: 23/08/1957.    
12/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
02/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1959. Dep: 12/02/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28810 (Diagram 100A)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
20/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61236 from March (31B)    
03/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev