Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 237 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2802 Week
» 1540 Month
» 415861 Year
» 1637426 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1237 on 24/09/1947
British Railways 61237   16/02/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1947 GEOFFREY H KITSON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26138
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service Tue 24/09/1947 to Neville Hill (NEV)
Withdrawal Tue 06/12/1966 off Wakefield (56A)
Scrapping Thu 16/02/1967 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)
Service Life 19 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 16/2/67 for scrap to Arrwtt Young, Parkgate

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEV Neville Hill (New) on 24/09/1947
52A Gateshead on 15/01/1961
52G Sunderland on 30/04/1961
52C Blaydon on 17/06/1962
52H Tyne Dock on 16/06/1963
56A Wakefield on 31/10/1965
   Withdrawn on 06/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NEV Neville Hill on 24/09/1947
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 5w/e 07/07/1962
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 4w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 2w/e 19/12/1964
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 4w/e 02/01/1965
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 06/11/1965
WDN   on 06/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
24/09/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9874)
16/02/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 3866)
23/09/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28104)
25/03/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28416)
16/07/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28461)
26/03/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28443)
17/01/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28858)
30/12/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
30/12/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28139)
10/07/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
27/04/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28113)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 15/01/1949 16/02/1949 33 days General
Boiler number 3866 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61237
 
Darlington Works 28/08/1950 23/09/1950 27 days General
Boiler number 28104 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 25/09/1950 26/09/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/10/1950 09/10/1950 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 03/03/1952 25/03/1952 23 days General
Boiler number 28416 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 24/06/1953 16/07/1953 23 days General
Boiler number 28461 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 12/06/1954 22/07/1954 41 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 03/03/1955 26/03/1955 24 days General
Boiler number 28443 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 28/03/1955 31/03/1955 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 26/04/1955 31/05/1955 36 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 16/07/1955 09/08/1955 25 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Darlington Works 10/10/1955 18/10/1955 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 19/12/1956 17/01/1957 30 days General
Boiler number 28858 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 28/06/1957 04/07/1957 7 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 04/07/1958 31/07/1958 28 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 25/11/1958 30/12/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 28139 (Diagram 100A)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 30/06/1959 10/07/1959 11 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 05/10/1959 05/10/1959 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 26/03/1962 27/04/1962 33 days General
Boiler number 28113 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 25/11/1963 21/12/1963 27 days Heavy Casual
Derailment damage
 
Darlington Works 23/12/1963 27/12/1963 5 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/10/1947 Queens Park Works Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos 1234 (16/9), 1235 (18/9), 1236 (22/9), 1237 (24/9), 1238 (26/9), 1239 (2/10), and 1240 (6/10). On 7/10 Nos. 1241 an 1242 were in the Paint Shop, while complete in the Erecting Shop were Nos. 1243-1246. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1234-1241 (26135-42/47) and 1243-1244 (26144-45/47). SLS/194711
28/02/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). SLS/194904
25/03/1962 Darlington MPD (Waiting works) Ex-Works on 51A: D3072, D3874, D5108, 43055, 43101, 60835, 60939, 61019/39, 63388, 65794, 65889/92, 68011, 80116, 90072, 90342, 90503. Waiting works on 51A: 12115, 43070/5, 46494, 60811/44, 61237, 68754, 78015, 92098. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/09/1947 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1237
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26138
Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
12/1947 Naming Named 'GEOFFREY H KITSON'    
15/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
30/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
17/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
31/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
06/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 61237 from Wakefield (56A)    

prev prev