|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/12/1948 | 08/01/1949 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 9876 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1950 | 16/05/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28229 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1951 | 01/09/1951 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1952 | 01/11/1952 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 28228 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1952 | 05/11/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 02/12/1953 | 09/12/1953 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1954 | 19/06/1954 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28406 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 14/10/1955 | 04/11/1955 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1956 | 22/05/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28434 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 21/09/1956 | 09/10/1956 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1958 | 28/03/1958 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28424 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1959 | 29/04/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/01/1961 | 18/02/1961 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28205 (Diagram 100A) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1961 | 25/03/1961 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1961 | 04/07/1961 | 47 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1964 | 26/11/1964 | 59 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/10/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos 1234 (16/9), 1235 (18/9), 1236 (22/9), 1237 (24/9), 1238 (26/9), 1239 (2/10), and 1240 (6/10). On 7/10 Nos. 1241 an 1242 were in the Paint Shop, while complete in the Erecting Shop were Nos. 1243-1246. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1234-1241 (26135-42/47) and 1243-1244 (26144-45/47). | SLS/194711 |
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/09/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1238 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26139 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
12/1947 | Naming | Named 'LESLIE RUNCIMAN' | ||
11/07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61238 | ||
04/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9876 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1950. Dep: 16/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28229 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/08/1951. Dep: 01/09/1951. | ||
13/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28228 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1952. Dep: 05/11/1952. | ||
02/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/12/1953. Dep: 09/12/1953. | ||
25/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1954. Dep: 19/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28406 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/10/1955. Dep: 04/11/1955. | ||
20/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1956. Dep: 22/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28434 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/09/1956. Dep: 09/10/1956. | ||
10/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
04/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1958. Dep: 28/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28424 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1959. Dep: 29/04/1959. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
09/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1961. Dep: 18/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28205 (Diagram 100A) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
25/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/03/1961. Dep: 25/03/1961. | ||
19/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/05/1961. Dep: 04/07/1961. | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
07/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
29/09/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/09/1964. Dep: 26/11/1964. | ||
31/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
17/02/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61238 from York (North) (50A) | ||
24/04/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |