|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 19/05/1949 | 19/05/1949 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1949 | 06/10/1949 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 9861 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1949 | 12/10/1949 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/07/1951 | 25/08/1951 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28226 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1953 | 24/10/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28248 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1953 | 27/10/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1954 | 13/09/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1955 | 21/10/1955 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28559 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1956 | 01/02/1956 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1957 | 07/12/1957 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28439 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1957 | 11/12/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1958 | 12/08/1958 | 35 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1959 | 09/07/1959 | 15 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1960 | 07/04/1960 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28456 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1960 | 16/09/1960 | 8 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1947 | Darlington | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1241 (8/10), 1242 (10/10), 1243 (14/10), 1244 (16/10), 1245 (20/10), 1246 (22/10), 1247 (24/10), 1248 (27/10), 1249 (29/10), 1250 (31/10)), 1251 (4/11) and 1252 (6/11), which with 1239 (2/10) and 1240 (6/10) give a total of twelve ex Works during October. Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1242 (26143/47) and 1245-1250 (26146/47-26151/47). No. 1250 is the first loco. ex N.B. Loco. Co. Ltd. noted with electric headlamps fitted to engine and tender. | SLS/194712 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/10/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1241 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26142 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
12/1947 | Naming | Named 'VISCOUNT RIDLEY' | ||
18/07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61241 | ||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
19/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 19/05/1949. Dep: 19/05/1949. | ||
09/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1949. Dep: 06/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9861 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/10/1949. Dep: 12/10/1949. | ||
12/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
18/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
16/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1951. Dep: 25/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28226 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1953. Dep: 24/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28248 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/10/1953. Dep: 27/10/1953. | ||
06/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1954. Dep: 13/09/1954. | ||
24/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1955. Dep: 21/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28559 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/01/1956. Dep: 01/02/1956. | ||
14/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1957. Dep: 07/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28439 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/12/1957. Dep: 11/12/1957. | ||
09/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1958. Dep: 12/08/1958. | ||
25/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/06/1959. Dep: 09/07/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
07/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1960. Dep: 07/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28456 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
09/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1960. Dep: 16/09/1960. | ||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
02/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61241 from Heaton (52B) | ||
19/03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |