|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 22/12/1947 | 23/12/1947 | 2 days | Unclassified | For naming only Named SIR HAROLD MITCHELL |
||
Cowlairs Works | 31/01/1949 | 19/03/1949 | 48 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61243 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/04/1949 | 06/04/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/01/1951 | 23/02/1951 | 26 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/11/1951 | 15/12/1951 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/11/1952 | 29/11/1952 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 28656 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/05/1953 | 14/05/1953 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/10/1953 | 12/10/1953 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/11/1953 | 16/11/1953 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/01/1954 | 05/01/1954 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/05/1954 | 08/05/1954 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/01/1955 | 12/02/1955 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | WPU Gear removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/02/1957 | 02/03/1957 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28668 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/06/1957 | 08/06/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/05/1958 | 31/05/1958 | 23 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/03/1959 | 20/03/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 31/03/1961 | 06/05/1961 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28666 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1947 | Darlington | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1241 (8/10), 1242 (10/10), 1243 (14/10), 1244 (16/10), 1245 (20/10), 1246 (22/10), 1247 (24/10), 1248 (27/10), 1249 (29/10), 1250 (31/10)), 1251 (4/11) and 1252 (6/11), which with 1239 (2/10) and 1240 (6/10) give a total of twelve ex Works during October. Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1242 (26143/47) and 1245-1250 (26146/47-26151/47). No. 1250 is the first loco. ex N.B. Loco. Co. Ltd. noted with electric headlamps fitted to engine and tender. | SLS/194712 |
15/11/1947 | Eastfield MPD | On 15/11 No. 1255 was observed here with the wrong Maker's Plate (26157/47), while on 23/11 No. 1256 was seen with the same plates: Nos. 1255 and 1258 were both without plates on 23/11. On 7/12 No. 1067 KIT, which had been repainted green, was seen at Cowlairs West Junction being hauled from Cowlairs Works to Eastfield by 'J.83' No. 8475. On 17/12 No. 1244 Strang Steel HAY was here, being ex Cowlairs Works that day, after having had the nameplates fitted. This is believed to be the first Scottish Area 'B.1' to receive nameplates. On 1/1 No. 1243 EFD was noted here fitted with nameplates-Sir Harold Mitchell. The size of the letters appears to be smaller than that previously used, being between 21' and 3' high. Perhaps the most interesting 'foreigners' on the shed here on the same day were: Nos. 3041 ABD, 3137 HTN and 3190 TWD, the latter carrying both TWD and HTN on the buffer-beam. Nos. 77312 STM and 77313 THJ have been noted here recently, both carrying L.M.S. 15A shed plates, as well as their L.N.E. sheds stencilled or painted on the buffer-beam. Both these engines were regular visitors to Glasgow during the war-but on the L.M.S.-when working from 12A. It is very rare for N.E. Area Class '0.7's' or W.D.'s to appear at Eastfield. | SLS/194802 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/10/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1243 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26144 Allocated to Eastfield (EFD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
22/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/12/1947. Dep: 23/12/1947. Work undertaken: For naming only Named SIR HAROLD MITCHELL |
||
31/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1949. Dep: 19/03/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61243 |
||
04/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/04/1949. Dep: 06/04/1949. | ||
29/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/01/1951. Dep: 23/02/1951. | ||
19/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1951. Dep: 15/12/1951. | ||
11/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1952. Dep: 29/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28656 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1953. Dep: 14/05/1953. | ||
12/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/10/1953. Dep: 12/10/1953. | ||
16/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/11/1953. Dep: 16/11/1953. | ||
05/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/01/1954. Dep: 05/01/1954. | ||
03/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/05/1954. Dep: 08/05/1954. | ||
20/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/01/1955. Dep: 12/02/1955. Work undertaken: WPU Gear removed |
||
08/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1957. Dep: 02/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28668 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/06/1957. Dep: 08/06/1957. | ||
09/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/05/1958. Dep: 31/05/1958. | ||
10/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1959. Dep: 20/03/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
31/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1961. Dep: 06/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28666 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) | ||
11/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ayr (67C) | ||
04/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61243 from Ayr (67C) | ||
07/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon |