|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1949 | 26/08/1949 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 9833 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61247 |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1951 | 21/06/1951 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28145 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1953 | 27/03/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28245 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1954 | 23/02/1954 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1954 | 01/09/1954 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1955 | 15/03/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28140 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1955 | 18/07/1955 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1955 | 29/08/1955 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1955 | 18/10/1955 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1957 | 12/10/1957 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28422 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1957 | 18/10/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1959 | 05/12/1959 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28188 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1960 | 27/01/1960 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1960 | 01/12/1960 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1962 | 01/06/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1947 | Darlington | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1241 (8/10), 1242 (10/10), 1243 (14/10), 1244 (16/10), 1245 (20/10), 1246 (22/10), 1247 (24/10), 1248 (27/10), 1249 (29/10), 1250 (31/10)), 1251 (4/11) and 1252 (6/11), which with 1239 (2/10) and 1240 (6/10) give a total of twelve ex Works during October. Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1242 (26143/47) and 1245-1250 (26146/47-26151/47). No. 1250 is the first loco. ex N.B. Loco. Co. Ltd. noted with electric headlamps fitted to engine and tender. | SLS/194712 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/10/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1247 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26148 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
12/1947 | Naming | Named 'LORD BURGHLEY' | ||
18/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1949. Dep: 26/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9833 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61247 |
||
28/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1951. Dep: 21/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28145 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1953. Dep: 27/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28245 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 23/02/1954. Dep: 23/02/1954. | ||
01/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 01/09/1954. Dep: 01/09/1954. | ||
15/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1955. Dep: 15/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28140 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 18/07/1955. Dep: 18/07/1955. | ||
29/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 29/08/1955. Dep: 29/08/1955. | ||
18/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 18/10/1955. Dep: 18/10/1955. | ||
18/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1957. Dep: 12/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28422 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/10/1957. Dep: 18/10/1957. | ||
11/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1959. Dep: 05/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28188 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/01/1960. Dep: 27/01/1960. | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
28/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/11/1960. Dep: 01/12/1960. | ||
06/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
01/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 01/06/1962. Dep: 01/06/1962. | ||
12/06/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61247 from Colwick (40E) |