|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1950 | 02/06/1950 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3755 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61248 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1951 | 19/03/1951 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1951 | 22/08/1951 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1952 | 29/04/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28189 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1954 | 10/07/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28433 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1955 | 21/09/1955 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1957 | 06/04/1957 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28269 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 06/05/1959 | 19/06/1959 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28152 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1959 | 28/10/1959 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1961 | 05/10/1961 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28818 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1947 | Darlington | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1241 (8/10), 1242 (10/10), 1243 (14/10), 1244 (16/10), 1245 (20/10), 1246 (22/10), 1247 (24/10), 1248 (27/10), 1249 (29/10), 1250 (31/10)), 1251 (4/11) and 1252 (6/11), which with 1239 (2/10) and 1240 (6/10) give a total of twelve ex Works during October. Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1242 (26143/47) and 1245-1250 (26146/47-26151/47). No. 1250 is the first loco. ex N.B. Loco. Co. Ltd. noted with electric headlamps fitted to engine and tender. | SLS/194712 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/10/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1248 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26149 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
12/1947 | Naming | Named 'GEOFFREY GIBBS' | ||
08/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1950. Dep: 02/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3755 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61248 |
||
11/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/03/1951. Dep: 19/03/1951. | ||
13/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/08/1951. Dep: 22/08/1951. | ||
01/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1952. Dep: 29/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28189 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1954. Dep: 10/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28433 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/12/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
08/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
15/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/08/1955. Dep: 21/09/1955. | ||
19/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
13/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1957. Dep: 06/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28269 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1959. Dep: 19/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28152 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
14/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/10/1959. Dep: 28/10/1959. | ||
22/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
30/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1961. Dep: 05/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28818 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
07/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61248 from Colwick (40E) | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |