Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 2 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2863 Week
» 21645 Month
» 269938 Year
» 1154319 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1252   06/11/1947
BR 61252   10/06/1949
DP (Dept) 22 m/e 12/1963

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26153
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Mon 06/11/1947 to Ipswich (IPS)
Withdrawal Mon 25/11/1963 off March (31B)
Scrapping During 06/1964 at R A Kings (Norwich)
Service Life 16 yrs , 19 dys
Information Transferred to Departmental Stock for use as a stationary boiler for train heating purposes. Drawhook removed to preclude use as a normal engine.

Notes
Notes Made S B Dept'l N0 22
Sold 6/64 for scrap to R A King, Norwich

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IPS Ipswich (New) 06/11/1947
31B March 01/11/1959
31A Cambridge 10/01/1960
32A Norwich Thorpe 20/11/1960
30A Stratford 10/09/1961
31B March 24/09/1961
   Withdrawn 25/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW IPS Ipswich 06/11/1947
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 26/11/1960
ALLOC 31B March 5w/e 07/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/11/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9889)
10/06/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9891)
03/02/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28527)
29/11/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28581)
30/07/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28867)
10/03/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28573)
15/11/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28593)
15/11/1957 Modified bogie springs fitted
05/06/1959 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
05/06/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28572)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Stratford Works 04/04/1949 10/06/1949 68 days General
Boiler number 9891 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61252
 
Stratford Works 10/12/1950 03/02/1951 56 days General
Boiler number 28527 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 16/10/1952 29/11/1952 45 days General
Boiler number 28581 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 14/06/1954 30/07/1954 47 days General
Boiler number 28867 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 31/01/1956 10/03/1956 40 days General
Boiler number 28573 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 11/10/1957 15/11/1957 36 days General
Boiler number 28593 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
 
Stratford Works 20/04/1959 05/06/1959 47 days General
Boiler number 28572 (Diagram 100A)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 02/01/1962 07/02/1962 37 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/11/1947 To Service To service as LNER Number 1252
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26153
Allocated to Ipswich (IPS)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
04/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1949. Dep: 10/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9891 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61252
   
10/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1950. Dep: 03/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28527 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1952. Dep: 29/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28581 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1954. Dep: 30/07/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28867 (Diagram 100A)
   
05/08/1954 Sightings Stratford Works visit: Around the works. - Freshly painted on shed/yard. RO 9/1954 Link
31/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1956. Dep: 10/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28573 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1957. Dep: 15/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28593 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
   
20/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1959. Dep: 05/06/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28572 (Diagram 100A)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
01/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
10/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
10/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
24/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
02/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1962. Dep: 07/02/1962.    
25/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 61252 from March (31B)    
12/1963 Renumbered Renumbered to 22    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by R A Kings: Norwich    

prev prev