Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3115 Week
» 14686 Month
» 262979 Year
» 1147360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1253   10/11/1947
BR 61253   16/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26154
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 10/11/1947 to Stratford (STR)
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962 off Stratford (30A)
Scrapping Mon 19/11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 14 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes 19/11/62 In for cutting up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford (New) 10/11/1947
IPS Ipswich 16/11/1947
31B March 01/11/1959
31A Cambridge 10/01/1960
32A Norwich Thorpe 20/11/1960
30A Stratford 10/09/1961
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW STR Stratford 10/11/1947
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 22/11/1947
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 26/11/1960
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/11/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9890)
16/06/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9872)
17/02/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28530)
18/10/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28592)
02/07/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28102)
14/02/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28421)
20/06/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28397)
20/06/1958 Modified bogie springs fitted
16/04/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28554)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Stratford Works 24/04/1949 16/06/1949 54 days General
Boiler number 9872 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61253
 
Stratford Works 04/01/1951 17/02/1951 45 days General
Boiler number 28530 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 08/09/1952 18/10/1952 41 days General
Boiler number 28592 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 02/02/1953 07/02/1953 6 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 30/03/1953 08/04/1953 10 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 01/06/1954 02/07/1954 32 days General
Boiler number 28102 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 16/01/1956 14/02/1956 30 days General
Boiler number 28421 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 12/02/1957 04/04/1957 52 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 11/06/1957 28/06/1957 18 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 29/04/1958 20/06/1958 53 days General
Boiler number 28397 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
 
Doncaster Works 11/03/1960 16/04/1960 37 days General
Boiler number 28554 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/11/1947 To Service To service as LNER Number 1253
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26154
Allocated to Stratford (STR)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
16/11/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
24/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1949. Dep: 16/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9872 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61253
   
04/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1951. Dep: 17/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28530 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28592 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953.    
30/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1953. Dep: 08/04/1953.    
01/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1954. Dep: 02/07/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28102 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1956. Dep: 14/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28421 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/02/1957. Dep: 04/04/1957.    
11/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/06/1957. Dep: 28/06/1957.    
29/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1958. Dep: 20/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28397 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
   
01/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
10/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
11/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1960. Dep: 16/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28554 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
10/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61253 from Stratford (30A)    
19/11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev