|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 21/03/1949 | 14/05/1949 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 9908 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61254 |
||
Stratford Works | 02/11/1950 | 16/12/1950 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28515 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 12/05/1952 | 28/06/1952 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 28587 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 15/12/1953 | 23/01/1954 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28259 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/12/1955 | 11/01/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28203 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 04/03/1957 | 03/05/1957 | 61 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 23/06/1958 | 25/06/1958 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 08/12/1958 | 30/01/1959 | 54 days | General | Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1961 | 03/03/1961 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28867 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1253 (10/11), 1254 (12/11), 1255 (14/11), 1256 (17/11), 1257 (19/11), 1258 (21/11), 1259 (24/11), 1260 (26/11), 1261 (28/11), 1262 (1/12), 1263 (3/12), 1264 (5/12), 1265 (9/12), 1266 (10/12), 1267 (12/12), 1268 (16/12), 1269 (24/12), 1270 (25/12), 1271 (26/12), 1272 (29/12) and 1273 (30/12). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1251 (26152/47), 1252 (26153/47), 1253 (26154/47), 1254 (26155/47), 1256 (26157/47), 1257 (26158/47), 1259 (26160/47), 1260 (26161/47), 1261 (26162/47), 1263 (26164/47), 1264 (26165/47), 1266 (26167/47), 1267 (26168/47), 1270 (26171/47), 1271 (26172/47) and 1272 (26173/47). | SLS/194802 |
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Old Works) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
21/11/1960 | G.E. Dieselisation | Extensive dieselisation has taken place on the GE and a considerable re-shuffle of diesels between March, Ipswich and Stratford took place on 21st November. Cambridge has lost all its passenger turns (steam) and its entire allocation of Bls (61046/8/66/71/82, 61236/52/3/4/80/3) has been transferred to March and Norwich, leaving 16 steam engines allocated. South Lynn is now a sub-shed of March, its allocation being 43089/90, 65548/77 an 68499. Lowestoft has lost its 3 steam engines (65462, 65588 and 68642) to store at Trowse and is completely diesel, i.e. D2039, D2553/5/68/70/3. | SLS/196101 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/11/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1254 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26155 Allocated to Stratford (STR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
10/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
25/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
21/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1949. Dep: 14/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9908 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61254 |
||
02/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1950. Dep: 16/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28515 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1952. Dep: 28/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28587 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1953. Dep: 23/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28259 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1955. Dep: 11/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28203 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1957. Dep: 03/05/1957. | ||
23/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/06/1958. Dep: 25/06/1958. | ||
08/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1958. Dep: 30/01/1959. Work undertaken: Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
10/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
20/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
01/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1961. Dep: 03/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28867 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/02/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61254 from March (31B) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |