|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 03/01/1949 | 11/02/1949 | 40 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61258 |
||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1950 | 05/08/1950 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 9941 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1951 | 08/11/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28231 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1953 | 06/11/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28753 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1954 | 04/11/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1955 | 27/10/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28302 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1958 | 31/01/1958 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28248 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1958 | 07/02/1958 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1959 | 03/09/1959 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1960 | 09/04/1960 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28549 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1960 | 23/09/1960 | 11 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1253 (10/11), 1254 (12/11), 1255 (14/11), 1256 (17/11), 1257 (19/11), 1258 (21/11), 1259 (24/11), 1260 (26/11), 1261 (28/11), 1262 (1/12), 1263 (3/12), 1264 (5/12), 1265 (9/12), 1266 (10/12), 1267 (12/12), 1268 (16/12), 1269 (24/12), 1270 (25/12), 1271 (26/12), 1272 (29/12) and 1273 (30/12). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1251 (26152/47), 1252 (26153/47), 1253 (26154/47), 1254 (26155/47), 1256 (26157/47), 1257 (26158/47), 1259 (26160/47), 1260 (26161/47), 1261 (26162/47), 1263 (26164/47), 1264 (26165/47), 1266 (26167/47), 1267 (26168/47), 1270 (26171/47), 1271 (26172/47) and 1272 (26173/47). | SLS/194802 |
15/11/1947 | Eastfield MPD | On 15/11 No. 1255 was observed here with the wrong Maker's Plate (26157/47), while on 23/11 No. 1256 was seen with the same plates: Nos. 1255 and 1258 were both without plates on 23/11. On 7/12 No. 1067 KIT, which had been repainted green, was seen at Cowlairs West Junction being hauled from Cowlairs Works to Eastfield by 'J.83' No. 8475. On 17/12 No. 1244 Strang Steel HAY was here, being ex Cowlairs Works that day, after having had the nameplates fitted. This is believed to be the first Scottish Area 'B.1' to receive nameplates. On 1/1 No. 1243 EFD was noted here fitted with nameplates-Sir Harold Mitchell. The size of the letters appears to be smaller than that previously used, being between 21' and 3' high. Perhaps the most interesting 'foreigners' on the shed here on the same day were: Nos. 3041 ABD, 3137 HTN and 3190 TWD, the latter carrying both TWD and HTN on the buffer-beam. Nos. 77312 STM and 77313 THJ have been noted here recently, both carrying L.M.S. 15A shed plates, as well as their L.N.E. sheds stencilled or painted on the buffer-beam. Both these engines were regular visitors to Glasgow during the war-but on the L.M.S.-when working from 12A. It is very rare for N.E. Area Class '0.7's' or W.D.'s to appear at Eastfield. | SLS/194802 |
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
09/09/1963 | Lincoln MPD | The allocation of D1531/2/3/4 to Darnall has released Brush d/es D5801/2/3/53/4 for work at Lincoln and eventual elimination of steam but on 9th September the steam allocation was-43086/95/104/5/49, 61006/26/41/2/58/89/95/107/13/62/223/58/348/84/409, 90223/460/577. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/11/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1258 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26159 Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
03/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1949. Dep: 11/02/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61258 |
||
27/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1950. Dep: 05/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9941 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1951. Dep: 08/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28231 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
29/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
12/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1953. Dep: 06/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28753 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1954. Dep: 04/11/1954. | ||
26/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1955. Dep: 27/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28302 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1958. Dep: 31/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28248 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1958. Dep: 07/02/1958. | ||
24/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/08/1959. Dep: 03/09/1959. | ||
10/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1960. Dep: 09/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28549 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/09/1960. Dep: 23/09/1960. | ||
05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61258 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
18/03/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |