|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 31/12/1948 | 29/01/1949 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 9875 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61259 |
||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1950 | 06/06/1950 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 9912 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1950 | 16/06/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1951 | 14/09/1951 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28228 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1952 | 03/07/1952 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 16/07/1952 | 23/08/1952 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28445 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1952 | 27/08/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 28230 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1953 | 04/12/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1953 | 15/12/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1955 | 01/06/1955 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28113 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/01/1957 | 09/02/1957 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28641 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1957 | 12/02/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1958 | 16/12/1958 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28545 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1958 | 22/12/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1959 | 26/08/1959 | 14 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1961 | 19/10/1961 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28245 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1253 (10/11), 1254 (12/11), 1255 (14/11), 1256 (17/11), 1257 (19/11), 1258 (21/11), 1259 (24/11), 1260 (26/11), 1261 (28/11), 1262 (1/12), 1263 (3/12), 1264 (5/12), 1265 (9/12), 1266 (10/12), 1267 (12/12), 1268 (16/12), 1269 (24/12), 1270 (25/12), 1271 (26/12), 1272 (29/12) and 1273 (30/12). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1251 (26152/47), 1252 (26153/47), 1253 (26154/47), 1254 (26155/47), 1256 (26157/47), 1257 (26158/47), 1259 (26160/47), 1260 (26161/47), 1261 (26162/47), 1263 (26164/47), 1264 (26165/47), 1266 (26167/47), 1267 (26168/47), 1270 (26171/47), 1271 (26172/47) and 1272 (26173/47). | SLS/194802 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/11/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1259 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26160 Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
31/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1948. Dep: 29/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9875 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61259 |
||
10/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1950. Dep: 06/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9912 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/06/1950. Dep: 16/06/1950. | ||
22/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1951. Dep: 14/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28228 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/06/1952. Dep: 03/07/1952. | ||
16/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1952. Dep: 23/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28445 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/08/1952. Dep: 27/08/1952. | ||
10/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28230 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1953. Dep: 04/12/1953. | ||
09/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/12/1953. Dep: 15/12/1953. | ||
29/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1955. Dep: 01/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28113 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28641 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1957. Dep: 12/02/1957. | ||
12/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1958. Dep: 16/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28545 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
18/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/12/1958. Dep: 22/12/1958. | ||
13/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/08/1959. Dep: 26/08/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
05/02/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
25/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1961. Dep: 19/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28245 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
26/08/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61259 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
10/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |