|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 29/11/1948 | 30/11/1948 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1949 | 11/06/1949 | 19 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61260 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/08/1950 | 13/09/1950 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/12/1950 | 20/01/1951 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/10/1952 | 15/11/1952 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 28627 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/03/1953 | 27/03/1953 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/05/1953 | 19/05/1953 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/01/1954 | 12/02/1954 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
02/11/1954 | 25/11/1954 | 24 days | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 29/11/1954 | 01/12/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/03/1955 | 18/03/1955 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/09/1955 | 24/09/1955 | 20 days | Light Intermediate | WPU Gear removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/08/1956 | 25/08/1956 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/09/1956 | 21/09/1956 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
R & W Hawthorn | 01/07/1957 | 10/07/1957 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/11/1957 | 07/12/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28212 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 26/03/1959 | 08/04/1959 | 14 days | Light Casual | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/12/1959 | 16/01/1960 | 25 days | 1-1/l | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/06/1961 | 01/07/1961 | 18 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1253 (10/11), 1254 (12/11), 1255 (14/11), 1256 (17/11), 1257 (19/11), 1258 (21/11), 1259 (24/11), 1260 (26/11), 1261 (28/11), 1262 (1/12), 1263 (3/12), 1264 (5/12), 1265 (9/12), 1266 (10/12), 1267 (12/12), 1268 (16/12), 1269 (24/12), 1270 (25/12), 1271 (26/12), 1272 (29/12) and 1273 (30/12). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1251 (26152/47), 1252 (26153/47), 1253 (26154/47), 1254 (26155/47), 1256 (26157/47), 1257 (26158/47), 1259 (26160/47), 1260 (26161/47), 1261 (26162/47), 1263 (26164/47), 1264 (26165/47), 1266 (26167/47), 1267 (26168/47), 1270 (26171/47), 1271 (26172/47) and 1272 (26173/47). | SLS/194802 |
05/06/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. | SLS/194907 |
11/09/1963 | Inverurie Works (Scrapped) | In Shops: 44724, 45066, 80126; awaiting shops-42737, 45475. Shopped during period 5/8-6/9: 42129, 65234, 65908/22, D6140/3/4. Scrapped during same period: 57565, 61260, 65210/41/60, 67606/15/49/74. Being cup up: 60851, 65316. Awaiting cut up: 60959, 64568, 90536/42. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/11/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1260 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26161 Allocated to Eastfield (EFD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
29/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/11/1948. Dep: 30/11/1948. | ||
24/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/05/1949. Dep: 11/06/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61260 |
||
24/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/08/1950. Dep: 13/09/1950. | ||
29/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/12/1950. Dep: 20/01/1951. | ||
31/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1952. Dep: 15/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28627 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/03/1953. Dep: 27/03/1953. | ||
19/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1953. Dep: 19/05/1953. | ||
14/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/01/1954. Dep: 12/02/1954. | ||
29/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/11/1954. Dep: 01/12/1954. | ||
11/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1955. Dep: 18/03/1955. | ||
05/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/09/1955. Dep: 24/09/1955. Work undertaken: WPU Gear removed |
||
14/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/08/1956. Dep: 25/08/1956. | ||
20/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/09/1956. Dep: 21/09/1956. | ||
21/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
01/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/07/1957. Dep: 10/07/1957. | ||
06/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1957. Dep: 07/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28212 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/03/1959. Dep: 08/04/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
23/12/1959 | Works Visit | |||
18/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
14/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1961. Dep: 01/07/1961. | ||
01/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61260 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |