|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 17/05/1949 | 04/06/1949 | 19 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61261 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/05/1951 | 19/06/1951 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28635 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/07/1951 | 11/07/1951 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/01/1953 | 19/02/1953 | 35 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/12/1953 | 16/01/1954 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/03/1954 | 17/04/1954 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/08/1954 | 11/09/1954 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28652 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/05/1956 | 16/06/1956 | 31 days | Light Intermediate | |||
R & W Hawthorn | 26/10/1957 | 08/11/1957 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/07/1958 | 15/08/1958 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28625 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/10/1958 | 30/10/1958 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/03/1959 | 20/03/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/05/1959 | 05/06/1959 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/09/1960 | 29/10/1960 | 41 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/01/1963 | 02/03/1963 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 28619 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/10/1963 | 17/10/1963 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/05/1966 | 03/06/1966 | 26 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1253 (10/11), 1254 (12/11), 1255 (14/11), 1256 (17/11), 1257 (19/11), 1258 (21/11), 1259 (24/11), 1260 (26/11), 1261 (28/11), 1262 (1/12), 1263 (3/12), 1264 (5/12), 1265 (9/12), 1266 (10/12), 1267 (12/12), 1268 (16/12), 1269 (24/12), 1270 (25/12), 1271 (26/12), 1272 (29/12) and 1273 (30/12). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1251 (26152/47), 1252 (26153/47), 1253 (26154/47), 1254 (26155/47), 1256 (26157/47), 1257 (26158/47), 1259 (26160/47), 1260 (26161/47), 1261 (26162/47), 1263 (26164/47), 1264 (26165/47), 1266 (26167/47), 1267 (26168/47), 1270 (26171/47), 1271 (26172/47) and 1272 (26173/47). | SLS/194802 |
05/06/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. | SLS/194907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/11/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1261 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26162 Allocated to Eastfield (EFD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
17/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/05/1949. Dep: 04/06/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61261 |
||
23/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1951. Dep: 19/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28635 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1951. Dep: 11/07/1951. | ||
16/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 16/01/1953. Dep: 19/02/1953. | ||
31/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/12/1953. Dep: 16/01/1954. | ||
29/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/03/1954. Dep: 17/04/1954. | ||
06/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1954. Dep: 11/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28652 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/05/1956. Dep: 16/06/1956. | ||
21/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
26/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/10/1957. Dep: 08/11/1957. | ||
01/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1958. Dep: 15/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28625 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1958. Dep: 30/10/1958. | ||
26/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
09/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1959. Dep: 20/03/1959. | ||
27/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/05/1959. Dep: 05/06/1959. | ||
19/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/09/1960. Dep: 29/10/1960. | ||
31/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) | ||
10/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1963. Dep: 02/03/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28619 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ayr (67C) | ||
04/10/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/10/1963. Dep: 17/10/1963. | ||
31/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
09/05/1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1966. Dep: 03/06/1966. | ||
23/09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61261 from Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
11/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |