Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 496 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5097 Week
» 16644 Month
» 416326 Year
» 492913 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1264   05/12/1947
BR 61264   22/10/1949
DP (Dept) 29   12/1965

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L963
Works Number 26165
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 05/12/1947 to Stratford (STR)
Withdrawal Sun 21/11/1965 off Colwick (40E)
Service Life 17 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys
Information Transferred to Departmental Stock for use as a stationary boiler for train heating purposes. Drawhook removed to preclude use as a normal engine.

Notes
Notes Made S B Dept'l No 29 to 7/67.
Sold for scrap 3/68 to Woodham Bros , Barry
Re-sold for preservation & left Barry 7/76 for Main Line Steam Trust at Loughborough

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford (New) 05/12/1947
PKS Parkeston Quay 18/12/1947
40E Colwick 27/11/1960
   Withdrawn 21/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW STR Stratford 05/12/1947
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay w/e 20/12/1947
ALLOC 40E Colwick 5w/e 31/12/1960
WDN   w/e 21/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/12/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9901)
22/10/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9745)
17/11/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28571)
01/04/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28245)
24/05/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28520)
20/08/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28278)
20/08/1959 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
20/08/1959 Modified bogie springs fitted
07/09/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28592)

Preservation
Preservation Date 07/1976
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/12/2012


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Stratford Works 17/06/1949 28/06/1949 12 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 05/09/1949 22/10/1949 48 days General
Boiler number 9745 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61264
 
Stratford Works 28/09/1951 17/11/1951 51 days General
Boiler number 28571 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 23/12/1953 30/01/1954 39 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 01/03/1955 01/04/1955 32 days General
Boiler number 28245 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 19/03/1957 24/05/1957 67 days General
Boiler number 28520 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 03/02/1958 08/04/1958 65 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 15/06/1959 20/08/1959 67 days General
Boiler number 28278 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
 
Doncaster Works 09/07/1962 07/09/1962 61 days General
Boiler number 28592 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/12/1947 To Service To service as LNER Number 1264
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26165
Allocated to Stratford (STR)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
18/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
17/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/06/1949. Dep: 28/06/1949.    
05/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9745 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61264
   
28/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1951. Dep: 17/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28571 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/12/1953. Dep: 30/01/1954.    
01/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1955. Dep: 01/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28245 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1957. Dep: 24/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28520 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/02/1958. Dep: 08/04/1958.    
15/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1959. Dep: 20/08/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28278 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
   
27/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
09/07/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1962. Dep: 07/09/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28592 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 61264 from Colwick (40E)    
12/1965 Renumbered Renumbered to 29    

prev prev